Kawas et al v. Spies et al
Plaintiff: Anne Kawas and Paul Kawas
Defendant: James Spies, Darlene Spies and Dudley Do SSI, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00138
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/19/2021. Discovery due by 4/1/2021. Motions due by 8/2/2021. Pretrial Order due by 10/4/2021. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 6/1/2021. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 7/1/2021. Status Report due by 7/7/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 02/12/2021. (MG)
February 12, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/9/2021 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. Dial-in instructions will be provided by Courtroom Deputy Clerk prior to scheduled call. (KM)
February 5, 2021 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Webb, Mark)
February 5, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (csr)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 26(f) INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 1/20/21. (slt)
January 19, 2021 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Dudley Do SSI, LLC. (McQuigg, John)
January 19, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Dudley Do SSI, LLC, Darlene Spies, James Spies.(McQuigg, John)
January 19, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Darlene Spies, James Spies. Darlene Spies waiver sent on 12/24/2020, answer due 2/22/2021; James Spies waiver sent on 12/24/2020, answer due 2/22/2021. (McQuigg, John)
January 7, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for proof of service served on Dudley Do, SSI, LLC on 12/24/20, filed by Paul Kawas. (Webb, Mark)
January 7, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Dudley Do SSI, LLC answer due 1/14/2021. (csr)
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Anne Kawas, Paul Kawas. (MG)
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (MG)
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Anne Kawas, Paul Kawas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MG)
December 21, 2020 Filing fee: $402.00, receipt number AGASDC-2992048. (MG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kawas et al v. Spies et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Kawas
Represented By: Mark Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Kawas
Represented By: Mark Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Spies
Represented By: John Paul McQuigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darlene Spies
Represented By: John Paul McQuigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dudley Do SSI, LLC
Represented By: John Paul McQuigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?