Jekyll Island-State Park Authority v. Polygroup Macau Limited
Plaintiff: Jekyll Island-State Park Authority
Defendant: Polygroup Macau Limited
Case Number: 2:2021cv00008
Filed: January 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Brunswick Office
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Brief in Support re #55 MOTION to Strike or Disregard Eric Szweda's Errata Sheet or, in the Alternative, to Strike or Disregard Portions Thereof, (Document Sealed) filed by Jekyll Island-State Park Authority. (pts)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 SUR REPLY re #47 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the Alternative to Partially Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, (Document Sealed) filed by Jekyll Island-State Park Authority. (pts)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #54 Motion for Leave to File; granting #56 Motion for Leave to File. The Court hereby ORDERS the Clerk of Court to file the contents of Plaintiffs Surreply to Defendants Renewed Motion to Dismiss under seal on the docket. The Court further ORDERS the Clerk of Court to file Plaintiffs Brief in Support of its Motion to Strike and accompanying Exhibits 3 and 4 under seal on the docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 9/9/2022. (pts)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 TEXT ORDER granting #62 Motion for Leave of Absence by Kathryn Vance for the dates of September 16, 2022 through and including September 19, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on August 26, 2022. (edd)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Jekyll Island-State Park Authority for dates of : 09/16/22 - 09/19/22 by Jekyll Island-State Park Authority. Responses due by 9/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vance, Kathryn)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #62 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Jekyll Island-State Park Authority for dates of : 09/16/22 - 09/19/22. (thb)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Leave of Absence by Virginia Carron for the dates of August 31, 2022 through and including September 15, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on August 23, 2022. (edd)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Polygroup Macau Limited for dates of : August 31, 2022, through September 15, 2022 by Polygroup Macau Limited. Responses due by 9/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carron, Virginia)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #60 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Polygroup Macau Limited (slt)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 REPLY to Response to Motion re #55 MOTION to Strike or Disregard Eric Szweda's Errata Sheet or, in the Alternative, to Strike or Disregard Portions Thereof filed by Jekyll Island-State Park Authority. (Vance, Kathryn)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 NOTICE of Intent to File Reply by Jekyll Island-State Park Authority re #57 Response in Opposition to Motion,. (Vance, Kathryn)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 RESPONSE in Opposition re #55 MOTION to Strike or Disregard Eric Szweda's Errata Sheet or, in the Alternative, to Strike or Disregard Portions Thereof filed by Polygroup Macau Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Szweda)(Carron, Virginia)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #56 MOTION for Leave to File Brief and Exhibits Under Seal Re Dkt 55, #55 MOTION to Strike or Disregard Eric Szweda's Errata Sheet or, in the Alternative, to Strike or Disregard Portions Thereof. (thb)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to File Brief and Exhibits Under Seal Re Dkt 55 by Jekyll Island-State Park Authority. Responses due by 8/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vance, Kathryn)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION to Strike or Disregard Eric Szweda's Errata Sheet or, in the Alternative, to Strike or Disregard Portions Thereof by Jekyll Island-State Park Authority. Responses due by 8/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Court Reporter Email, #2 Exhibit 2: Email Serving Errata, #3 Text of Proposed Order 5: Striking Entire Errata, #4 Text of Proposed Order 6: Striking Portions of Errata)(Vance, Kathryn)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #54 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal (slt)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Jekyll Island-State Park Authority. Responses due by 7/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Quicker, Katrina)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE of Intent to File Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Defendant's Reply by Jekyll Island-State Park Authority re #52 Reply to Response to Motion. (Quicker, Katrina)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 REPLY to Response to Motion re #47 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the Alternative to Partially Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Polygroup Macau Limited. (Carron, Virginia)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 RESPONSE in Opposition to #47 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the Alternative to Partially Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, (Document Sealed) filed by Jekyll Island-State Park Authority. (kjm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/24/2022: #1 Declaration of Kathryn A. Vance, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15) (kjm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/25/2022: #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Exhibit 25, #29 Exhibit 26, #30 Exhibit 27, #31 Exhibit 28, #32 Exhibit 29, #33 Exhibit 30, #34 Exhibit 31, #35 Exhibit 32, #36 Exhibit 33, #37 Exhibit 34) (kjm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/25/2022: #38 Exhibit 35, #39 Exhibit 36, #40 Exhibit 37, #41 Exhibit 38, #42 Exhibit 39, #43 Exhibit 40, #44 Exhibit 41, #45 Exhibit 42, #46 Exhibit 43, #47 Exhibit 44, #48 Exhibit 45, #49 Exhibit 46, #50 Exhibit 47, #51 Exhibit 48, #53 Exhibit 49) (kjm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/25/2022: #54 Exhibit 50, #55 Exhibit 51, #56 Exhibit 52, #57 Exhibit 53, #58 Exhibit 54, #59 Exhibit 55, #60 Exhibit 56, #61 Exhibit 57, #62 Exhibit 58, #63 Exhibit 59, #64 Exhibit 60, #65 Exhibit 61, #66 Exhibit 62, #67 Exhibit 63, #68 Exhibit 64, #69 Exhibit 65, #70 Exhibit 66, #71 Exhibit 67, #72 Exhibit 68) (kjm).
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE of Intent to File Reply Brief to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative to Partially Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Polygroup Macau Limited. (Tanner, Robert)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #48 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on June 21, 2022. (jrb)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Jekyll Island-State Park Authority. Responses due by 7/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Quicker, Katrina)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the Alternative to Partially Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Polygroup Macau Limited. Responses due by 6/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - E. Szweda Deposition Transcript, #2 Exhibit 2 - PML Interrogatory Objections and Responses)(Carron, Virginia)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting in part and denying in part re #45 Consent MOTION to Set Deadlines for Renewed Motion to Dismiss. Defendant shall have until June 3, 2022 to file its renewed motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 5/24/22. (loh)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Motions No Longer Referred: #45 Consent MOTION to Set Deadlines for Renewed Motion to Dismiss (slt)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Renewed Motion to Dismiss due by 6/3/2022. (loh)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #45 Consent MOTION to Set Deadlines for Renewed Motion to Dismiss (slt)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Consent MOTION to Set Deadlines for Renewed Motion to Dismiss by Polygroup Macau Limited. Responses due by 6/6/2022. (Tanner, Robert)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting re #43 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. For good cause shown, I GRANT the Motion. Jurisdictional discovery will close on May 16, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 5/3/22. (loh)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Jurisdictional Discovery due by 5/16/2022. (loh)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery on Jurisdiction by Jekyll Island-State Park Authority. Responses due by 5/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Quicker, Katrina)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 *** Filed in Error.**** Modified on 5/2/2022 (csr). Pleading re-filed at #43 .
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #42 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery on Jurisdiction (slt)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #43 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery on Jurisdiction (slt)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting re #40 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 4/27/22. (loh)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Jekyll Island-State Park Authority. Responses due by 5/9/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Stipulated Protective Order)(Vance, Kathryn)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #40 Joint MOTION for Protective Order . (JH)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 TEXT ORDER granting #38 Motion for Leave of Absence by R. Brian Tanner for the dates of June 25, 2022 through and including July 4, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on April 7, 2022. (edd)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Polygroup Macau Limited for dates of : June 25, 2022, through July 4, 2022 by Polygroup Macau Limited. Responses due by 4/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tanner, Robert)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #38 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Polygroup Macau Limited for dates of : June 25, 2022, through July 4, 2022. (thb)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER denying Polygroup's #10 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice, and Grants JISPA's request for a limited period of jurisdictional discovery. The parties should explore these (and any closely related) issues within sixty (60) days from the entry date of this Order at which point Polygroup may re-urge its motion to dismiss, including any arguments under Rule 12(b) (6). Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 3/7/2022. (csr)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Jurisdictional Discovery due by 5/6/2022 re: #37 Order. (csr)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 BRIEF re #34 Motion Hearing Notice of Supplemental Authority to Support a Finding of Personal Jurisdiction by Jekyll Island-State Park Authority. (Quicker, Katrina)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 BRIEF re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Polygroup Macau Limited. (Tanner, Robert)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lisa G. Wood: Motion Hearing held on 1/13/2022 re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Polygroup Macau Limited. (Court Reporter Debbie Gilbert.) (WS)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Trenton Ward on behalf of Polygroup Macau Limited (Ward, Trenton)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 1/13/2022 10:00 AM in Brunswick - Courtroom No. 1 - before Judge Lisa G. Wood. (WS)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting re #31 Motion to Continue. The motion hearing is hereby continued until further Order of the Court. Counsel is reminded of their obligation to file motions for leaves of absence to avoid scheduling conflicts. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 12/13/21. (loh)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION to Continue by Jekyll Island-State Park Authority. Responses due by 12/23/2021. (Vance, Kathryn)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn A. Vance on behalf of Jekyll Island-State Park Authority (Vance, Kathryn)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Gordon Wright on behalf of Polygroup Macau Limited (Wright, Robert)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Virginia L. Carron on behalf of Polygroup Macau Limited (Carron, Virginia)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2021 02:00 PM in Brunswick - Courtroom No. 1 - before Judge Lisa G. Wood. (WS)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting the parties' joint #26 Motion for Extension of Time, which the Court construes as a motion to stay discovery deadlines. The Court Stays all discovery deadlines pending resolution of Defendant's motion to dismiss. The parties shall conduct their conference and file the requisite Rule 26(f) report within 21 days of final resolution of Defendant's motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 9/16/2021. (ca)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #26 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Hold Fed. R. Civ. P 26(f) Planning Conference. (thb)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Hold Fed. R. Civ. P 26(f) Planning Conference , by Polygroup Macau Limited. Responses due by 9/28/2021. (Tanner, Robert)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Def's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss filed by Polygroup Macau Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration Eric Szweda)(Tanner, Robert)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Filing Part 1 Affidavit of Kathryn A. Vance by Jekyll Island-State Park Authority re #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. (Attachments: #1 Part 2)(ca)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Filing Affidavit of Raquel M. Gayle by Jekyll Island-State Park Authority re #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. (ca) Modified on 8/23/2021 (ca).
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Filing Exhibit Part 1 Affidavit of Melissa R. Cruthirds by Jekyll Island-State Park Authority re #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3)(ca)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Filing Exhibit Part 1 Affidavit of Katrina M. Quicker by Jekyll Island-State Park Authority re #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5)(ca)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting the Plaintiff's #19 Motion for Leave to File Exhibits by Alternative Means. Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiff's Motion for Limited Discovery to the Court Clerk by email. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 8/20/2021. (ca)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits by Alternative Means by Jekyll Island-State Park Authority. Responses due by 9/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Quicker, Katrina)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Intent Pursuant to Local Rule 7.6 of Intent to File Reply Brief by Polygroup Macau Limited re #17 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Tanner, Robert)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, MOTION for Limited Discovery. (thb) Modified on 8/19/2021 (thb).
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition and Motion for Extension of Time to Respond re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION for Limited Discovery filed by Jekyll Island-State Park Authority. (Quicker, Katrina) Modified on 8/18/2021 (thb).
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re: #15 Motion to Withdraw #11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Court deems the motion to withdraw as counsel Withdrawn and Directs the Clerk to terminate the motion. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 8/4/2021. (csr)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE/MOTION by Jekyll Island-State Park Authority re #11 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Withdrawal of Motion. (Bradberry, Kevin) Modified on 8/4/2021 (csr).
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file its response to Defendant's motion to dismiss on or before August 17, 2021. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to extend this deadline upon the docket and record of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on August 3, 2021. (edd)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (slt)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Responses due by 8/17/2021. (slt)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Jekyll Island-State Park Authority. Responses due by 8/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Quicker, Katrina)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #11 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. After 14 days a notice of noncompliance will be submitted to a judicial officer for possible sanctions, to include dismissal. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 8/4/2021. (thb)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jekyll Island-State Park Authority. Responses due by 8/3/2021. (Bradberry, Kevin)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Polygroup Macau Limited. Responses due by 8/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Eric Steinmeyer)(Tanner, Robert)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Brian Tanner on behalf of Polygroup Macau Limited (Tanner, Robert)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jekyll Island-State Park Authority. Polygroup Macau Limited waiver sent on 4/21/2021, answer due 7/20/2021. (Quicker, Katrina)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Polygroup Macau Limited answer due 6/20/2021. (slt)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Polygroup Macau Limited on April 21, 2021 by Jekyll Island-State Park Authority. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Correspondence with Counsel for Polygroup Agreeing to Accept Waiver of Service of the Summons)(Quicker, Katrina)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Polygroup Macau Limited, filed by Jekyll Island-State Park Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Summer Waves Certificate of Registration 1593514, #2 Exhibit B: Summer Waves Certificate of Registration 5050873, #3 Exhibit C: Summer Waves Elite Certificate of Registration 4862985, #4 Exhibit D: Summer Waves Certificate of Registration 4862983, #5 Exhibit E: Summer Waves 3D Trademark File History, #6 Exhibit F: Summer Waves Elite Trademark File History, #7 Exhibit G: Summer Waves Trademark File History, #8 Exhibit H: Summer Escapes Family Pools)(Quicker, Katrina)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Polygroup Macau Limited. (csr)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Submitted (Quicker, Katrina)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Katrina M. Quicker on behalf of Jekyll Island-State Park Authority (Quicker, Katrina)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 01/25/2021. (MG)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Polygroup Macau Limited, filed by Jekyll Island-State Park Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(MG)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $402, receipt number AGASDC-3017065. (MG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jekyll Island-State Park Authority v. Polygroup Macau Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jekyll Island-State Park Authority
Represented By: Kevin Daniel Bradberry
Represented By: Katrina M. Quicker
Represented By: Kathryn A. Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polygroup Macau Limited
Represented By: Robert Brian Tanner
Represented By: Trenton Ward
Represented By: Virginia L. Carron
Represented By: Robert Gordon Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?