Stephens v. State of Georgia et al
Plaintiff: Dene Terrell Stephens
Defendant: State of Georgia, Courthouse of Glynn County and Unknown
Case Number: 2:2021cv00105
Filed: November 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER vacating the Magistrate Judge's #3 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is Granted. Plaintiff is directed to complete, sign and return both the Prisoner Trust Account Statement and the Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account to the Clerk within 30 days of this Order. Plaintiff advised of PLRA procedures. PLRA due by 01/19/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 12/20/2021. (csr) Modified on 12/20/2021 (thb).
December 17, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dene Terrell Stephens. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (gmh)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 VACATED - See #5 Order. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS dismissing without prejudice the #1 Complaint filed by Dene Terrell Stephens. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case, enter the appropriate judgment of dismissal and to deny Plaintiff leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 12/21/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 12/7/21. (wwp) Modified on 12/20/2021 (csr).
November 9, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint. Set Deadline: Compliance due by 11/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 IFP form)(ca)
November 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Dene Terrell Stephens.(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephens v. State of Georgia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dene Terrell Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courthouse of Glynn County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?