Blankinship et al v. Georgia Pacific LLC
Plaintiff: Xenia Blankinship, Spanline Dixon and Jeffrey Waters
Defendant: Georgia Pacific LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv00138
Filed: December 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice and denying as moot #4 Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 1/17/23. (wwp)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER denying as moot #19 Consent Motion to Extend Deadline to File First Amended Complaint, as Plaintiffs have filed a notice of voluntary dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on January 17, 2023. (edd)
January 11, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Xenia Blankinship, Spanline Dixon, Jeffrey Waters (Pacella, Mario)
January 4, 2023 MOTIONS REFERRED: #19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File First Amended Complaint. (csr)
January 3, 2023 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File First Amended Complaint re: #1 -2, filed by Xenia Blankinship, Spanline Dixon, Jeffrey Waters. Responses due by 1/17/2023. (Pacella, Mario) Modified on 1/4/2023 (csr).
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting [14,15] Amended Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mara Cohara. Quentin Marlin has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on December 23, 2022. (edd)
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting [13,16] Amended Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William Beck. Quentin Marlin has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on December 23, 2022. (edd)
December 22, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (slt)
December 21, 2022 Filing 16 AMENDED MOTION by Georgia Pacific LLC. Amendment to #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number BGASDC-3490868, Fee Amount $200, . (Marlin, Quentin) Modified on 12/22/2022 (slt).
December 21, 2022 Filing 15 AMENDED MOTION by Georgia Pacific LLC. Amendment to #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-3490884, Fee Amount $200, . (Marlin, Quentin) Modified on 12/22/2022 (slt).
December 20, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-3490884, Fee Amount $200, by Georgia Pacific LLC. Responses due by 1/3/2023. (Marlin, Quentin)
December 20, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number BGASDC-3490868, Fee Amount $200, by Georgia Pacific LLC. Responses due by 1/3/2023. (Marlin, Quentin)
December 20, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice and #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (slt)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dustin Solt. Mario Pacella has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on December 19, 2022. (edd)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Coulson. Mario Pacella has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on December 19, 2022. (edd)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven Liddle. Mario Pacella has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on December 19, 2022. (edd)
December 15, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Steven D. Liddle, #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Nicholas A. Coulson, #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Dustin Reed Solt (slt)
December 14, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Deficiencies re: #5 - #7 MOTIONS for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Steven D. Liddle, Nicholas A. Coulson, and Dustin Reed Solt. Compliance due by 12/28/2022. After 14 days a notice of noncompliance will be submitted to a judicial officer for possible sanctions, to include dismissal. (csr)
December 14, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE by Xenia Blankinship, Spanline Dixon, Jeffrey Waters re #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Steven D. Liddle Receipt Number AGASDC-3486753, Fee Amount $200,, #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Nicholas A. Coulson Receipt Number AGASDC-3486756, Fee Amount $200,, #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Dustin Reed Solt Receipt Number AGASDC-3486758, Fee Amount $200, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Liddle List of Cases, #2 Exhibit B--Coulson List of Cases, #3 Exhibit C--Solt List of Cases)(Pacella, Mario)
December 14, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Dustin Reed Solt Receipt Number AGASDC-3486758, Fee Amount $200, by Xenia Blankinship, Spanline Dixon, Jeffrey Waters. Responses due by 12/28/2022. (Pacella, Mario)
December 14, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Nicholas A. Coulson Receipt Number AGASDC-3486756, Fee Amount $200, by Xenia Blankinship, Spanline Dixon, Jeffrey Waters. Responses due by 12/28/2022. (Pacella, Mario)
December 14, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Steven D. Liddle Receipt Number AGASDC-3486753, Fee Amount $200, by Xenia Blankinship, Spanline Dixon, Jeffrey Waters. Responses due by 12/28/2022. (Pacella, Mario)
December 12, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Georgia Pacific LLC. Responses due by 12/26/2022. (Thompson, Philip)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 12/07/2022. (jlh)
December 7, 2022 Filing 2 Removal NOTICE to all Counsel of Record. (Set/Reset Deadlines: Georgia Pacific LLC answer due 12/13/2022; Compliance due by 12/17/2022.) (jlh)
December 6, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Glynn County, Georgia, case number CE22-01084, filed by Georgia Pacific LLC. (Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number AGASDC-3481747.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Service of Process, Summons, Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Mark Berry, #3 Exhibit C - Secretary of State Corporation Division Information, and #4 Civil Cover Sheet.) (jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blankinship et al v. Georgia Pacific LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xenia Blankinship
Represented By: Nicholas A. Coulson
Represented By: Dustin Reed Solt
Represented By: Mario Anthony Pacella
Represented By: Steven D. Liddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spanline Dixon
Represented By: Dustin Reed Solt
Represented By: Mario Anthony Pacella
Represented By: Nicholas A. Coulson
Represented By: Steven D. Liddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Waters
Represented By: Mario Anthony Pacella
Represented By: Nicholas A. Coulson
Represented By: Steven D. Liddle
Represented By: Dustin Reed Solt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Pacific LLC
Represented By: Philip M. Thompson
Represented By: Quentin L. Marlin
Represented By: Mara H. Cohara
Represented By: William Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?