Dezauche v. Aircraft Manufacturing & Design, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Daniel Dezauche
Defendant: Aircraft Manufacturing & Design, LLC, Garry Webster, Nancy M. Cannon, Terry Tiraboschi, John Degonia and John Does (1 - 100)
Case Number: 3:2011cv00071
Filed: July 13, 2011
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Dublin Office
County: Laurens
Referring Judge: W. Leon Barfield
Presiding Judge: Dudley H. Bowen
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 15:2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2015 159 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 149 Motion and 150 Motion. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 11/16/15. (cmr)
November 12, 2015 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 148 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 151 Motion for Attorney Fees; and denying as moot 152 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 11/12/15. (cmr)
October 9, 2015 147 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Eastman Aviation, Inc.; Fly Light Sport, LLC; Southeast Light Sport Aviation; George W. Bryce, Jr. and against Daniel Dezauche in accordance with the Order of this Court entered on 10/9/15. Signed on 10/9/15. (cmr)
July 23, 2015 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 112 Motion to Dismiss; granting 113 Motion for Leave to File. It is further ordered that this case is re-opened and back on active status. The supplement to the proposed pre-trial order shall be filed before the close of business, July 31, 2015. Defendants may file any response by the close of business, August 7, 2015. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 7/23/15. (cmr)
February 11, 2015 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 110 Motion for Leave to File and 110 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 2/11/15. (cmr)
February 6, 2015 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the trial assignment earlier scheduled for February 17, 2015, re 103 Notice of Jury Selection and Jury Trial is hereby vacated. The case will be reassigned for trial when Plaintiff completes his preparation, and the Court is assured th at the matter is ready to proceed to meaningful consideration by a jury summoned for that purpose. Until the case is reopened upon motion by Plaintiff, the captioned matter is closed for all purposes of statistical reporting. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 02/06/2015. (jah)
January 7, 2015 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND NOTICE OF PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS, (Pretrial Order due by 1/29/2015, Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/5/2015 01:00 PM in Dublin - 2nd Floor Courtroom before Judge Dudley H. Bowen, Jury Selection set for 2/17/2015 09:00 AM in Dublin - 2nd Floor Courtroom before Judge Dudley H. Bowen, Jury Trial set for 2/17/2015 09:00 AM in Dublin - 2nd Floor Courtroom before Judge Dudley H. Bowen). Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 1/7/15. (cmr)
July 25, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 MOTION for Leave to File (Reply to Defendant Webster's "Motion in Opposition to Motion for Default Judgment") filed by Daniel Dezauche. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 07/25/2012. (thb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dezauche v. Aircraft Manufacturing & Design, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Dezauche
Represented By: Donald Ross Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aircraft Manufacturing & Design, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garry Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy M. Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Tiraboschi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Degonia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does (1 - 100)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?