Hinkle v. Midland Credit Management Inc. et al

Defendant: Midland Funding LLC, Midland Credit Management Inc. and Encore Capital Group Inc.
Plaintiff: Teri Lynn Hinkle
Case Number: 3:2013cv00033
Filed: April 30, 2013
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Dublin Office
County: Dodge
Referring Judge: W. Leon Barfield
Presiding Judge: Dudley H. Bowen
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2014 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 93 Motion to Seal Document 97 Response in Opposition to Motion. Exhibit pages 86 - 124 shall remain sealed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 9/25/14. (cmr)
January 6, 2015 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 85 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 103 Motion to allow her errata sheet to be included in the record. The Clerk is directed to enter final judgment in favor of defendants and close this case. Costs are taxed in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 1/6/15. (cmr)
September 3, 2014 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the plaintiff to file her response to summary judgment as a sealed document with the Court. Defendant's shall file a brief by 9/12/14 explaining why plaintiff's response should be sealed instead of redacted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 9/3/14. (cmr)
September 5, 2014 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 95 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 9/5/14. (cmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hinkle v. Midland Credit Management Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Encore Capital Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teri Lynn Hinkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.