Deere & Company v. Rebel Auction Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Deere & Company
Defendant: Rebel Auction Company, Inc. and Four-D, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv00072
Filed: August 31, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Dublin Office
County: Jeff Davis
Presiding Judge: Dudley H. Bowen
Presiding Judge: Brian K. Epps
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER deeming 40 Clerk's Judgment satisfied. It Is Further Ordered that the Clerk is instructed to vacate 41 Writ of Execution issued on November 22, 2016. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 12/16/2016. (thb)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER directing the Clerk to enter a judgment in favor of Plaintiff in the amount of $109,922.43 plus interest accruing thereon; granting 37 Motion For Issuance of Execution. The Clerk is directed to enter a Writ of Execution forthwith against Defendants Rebel Auction Company, Inc. and Four-D, Inc., both Georgia corporations, in the amount of $24,444.78 plus interest accruing from September 27, 2016. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 11/22/2016. (thb)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER awarding Plaintiff an additional $2,999.50 in attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 10/11/2016. (thb)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CONSENT ORDER/JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 8/8/16. (cmr)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 24 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Court will conduct an evidentiary hearing on the issue of damages, the hearing will be on July 20, 2016 at 11AM in the Dublin Courthouse. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 6/3/16. (cmr)
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 20 Motion to Compel; granting 21 Motion to Compel. Each Defendant is Ordered to provide full and complete responses to Plaintiff's discovery request on or before March 28, 2016. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 37(a)(5), Plaintiff is awarded attorney's fees in the total amount of $600.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 03/25/2016. (thb)
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying as moot 12 Motion to Stay; granting 13 Motion to Set Aside Default. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 11/20/15. (cmr)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 9/1/15. (cmr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deere & Company v. Rebel Auction Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deere & Company
Represented By: Hugh T. Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebel Auction Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Four-D, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?