Robbins v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Tosha Lynette Robbins
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 3:2017cv00005
Filed: January 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Dublin Office
County: Laurens
Presiding Judge: Dudley H. Bowen
Presiding Judge: Brian K. Epps
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 19 Motion for Attorney's Fees and costs and awards attorney's fees in the amount of $5,810.77 and costs in the amount of $600.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 07/10/2018. (jlh)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. This case stands closed. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 6/7/2018. (jlh)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER directing service of the 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on all parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 05/16/2018. (jlh)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER setting brief deadlines. (Plaintiff's Brief due by 7/28/2017). Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 6/28/17. (cmr)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting for Daniel S. Jones 3 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 2/9/17. (cmr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robbins v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tosha Lynette Robbins
Represented By: Trace Dillon
Represented By: Daniel S. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?