Wilcox v. Selph et al
Plaintiff: Mattheus Antuan Wilcox
Defendant: Bryan Selph, Jeffery Deal and Telfair County Sheriff's Department
Case Number: 3:2017cv00015
Filed: April 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Dublin Office
County: Telfair
Presiding Judge: Dudley H. Bowen
Presiding Judge: Brian K. Epps
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. This action stands closed. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 1/3/2018. (jlh)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ADOPTING 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS dismissing Plaintiff's claims against Magistrate Judge Bryan Selph and Telfair County Sheriff's Department and dismisses the said parties from the case. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 10/10/2017. (jlh)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Directing service of process to be effected on Defendant Deal. USMS shall mail copy of doc 4 and this order by first-class mail and request that Defendant waive formal service of the summons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 09/01/2015. (pts)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the plaintiff to amend the complaint within 14 days of the order, (Compliance due by 4/26/2017). Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 4/12/17. (cmr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilcox v. Selph et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mattheus Antuan Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Selph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Deal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telfair County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?