Davis et al v. Oasis Legal Finance Operating Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lizzie Davis, Dennis Green, Johnny Moody, John Suber, Shirley Williams and Pamela Davis
Defendant: Oasis Legal Finance Operating Company, LLC, Oasis Legal Finance, LLC and Oasis Legal Finance Holding Company, LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv00022
Filed: April 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Dublin Office
County: Laurens
Presiding Judge: Dudley H. Bowen
Presiding Judge: Brian K. Epps
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER denying 74 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 3/31/2020. (pts)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting 56 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying 59 Motion to Amend/Correct. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendants. This case stands closed. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 1/24/2020. (pts)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER making the 54 mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit the Order of this Court. In accordance therewith, the Court hereby vacates the stay of this case. The parties are directed to confer and submit a Rule 26(f) Report within 14 days. (Rule 26 Report due by 12/26/2019.) Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 12/12/2019. (pts)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 47 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 2/15/2018. (pts)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 9 Motion to Dismiss; denying 9 Motion to Strike. Count III (Usury) of Plaintiff's first amended complaint is dismissed. The parties are directed to submit a Rule 26(f) report pertaining to the remaining claims by 11/27/2017. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 11/15/2017. (pts)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER dismissing without prejudice defendant THL Credit, Inc. re 21 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Lizzie Davis, Pamela Davis, Dennis Green, Johnny Moody. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 5/17/17. (cmr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis et al v. Oasis Legal Finance Operating Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lizzie Davis
Represented By: Jeremy S. McKenzie
Represented By: Robert Bartley Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Green
Represented By: Jeremy S. McKenzie
Represented By: Robert Bartley Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Moody
Represented By: Jeremy S. McKenzie
Represented By: Robert Bartley Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Suber
Represented By: Jeremy S. McKenzie
Represented By: Robert Bartley Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Williams
Represented By: Jeremy S. McKenzie
Represented By: Robert Bartley Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Davis
Represented By: Jeremy S. McKenzie
Represented By: Robert Bartley Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oasis Legal Finance Operating Company, LLC
Represented By: William M. McErlean
Represented By: Christine Elizabeth Skoczylas
Represented By: Abby A. Vineyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oasis Legal Finance, LLC
Represented By: William M. McErlean
Represented By: Christine Elizabeth Skoczylas
Represented By: Abby A. Vineyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oasis Legal Finance Holding Company, LLC
Represented By: William M. McErlean
Represented By: Christine Elizabeth Skoczylas
Represented By: Abby A. Vineyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?