Evans v. Social Security Administration et al

Plaintiff: Tonya L. McMiller Evans
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 3:2018cv00027
Filed: April 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Dublin Office
County: Laurens
Presiding Judge: Dudley H. Bowen
Referring Judge: Brian K. Epps
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER STAYING Civil Proceedings in Light of Lapse in Appropriations. Signed by the judges of the Southern District of Georgia on 1/11/2019. (pts)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER directing service of the 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on all parites. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 09/18/2018. (jlh)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER setting brief deadline. (Brief due by 8/26/2018.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 07/27/2018. (jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Social Security Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya L. McMiller Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?