United Specialty Insurance Company v. E-Z Auto Sales, LLC et al

Plaintiff: United Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Wall Street Intermodal, LLC, Safepay Autobrokers, LLC, Kelly Little, Quanariek Roberson, Alexander Lopez Vazquez, Oseas Martinez, Cesar Perez, E-Z Auto Sales, LLC and Great West Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv00066
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Dudley H Bowen
Referring Judge: Brian K Epps
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2018 Filing 30 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to E-Z Auto Sales, LLC. (jlh)
November 2, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION for Entry of Default Clerk's by United Specialty Insurance Company. Responses due by 11/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Harris, David)
November 2, 2018 Filing 28 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Alexander Lopez Vazquez. (thb)
November 2, 2018 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United Specialty Insurance Company. E-Z Auto Sales, LLC served on 9/18/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Harris, David)
November 2, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION for Entry of Default Clerk's by United Specialty Insurance Company. Responses due by 11/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Harris, David)
October 31, 2018 Filing 24 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Kelly Little. (Keene, Dennis)
October 31, 2018 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint by Kelly Little.(Keene, Dennis)
October 31, 2018 Filing 22 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Wall Street Intermodal, LLC. (Keene, Dennis)
October 31, 2018 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint by Wall Street Intermodal, LLC.(Keene, Dennis)
October 16, 2018 Filing 20 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Great West Casualty Company. (Keene, Dennis)
October 16, 2018 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint by Great West Casualty Company.(Keene, Dennis)
October 15, 2018 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint by Quanariek Roberson, Safepay Autobrokers, LLC.(O'Connell, Tracy)
October 12, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Kelly Little answer due 11/2/2018; Wall Street Intermodal, LLC answer due 11/2/2018. (thb)
October 12, 2018 Filing 17 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #3 Rule 26(f) Order, #2 Disclosure Statement Local Rule 7.1.1, #1 Complaint, #4 Summons Issued Wall Street Intermodal, LLC Acknowledgement filed by United Specialty Insurance Company. (Harris, David)
October 12, 2018 Filing 16 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #3 Rule 26(f) Order, #2 Disclosure Statement Local Rule 7.1.1, #1 Complaint, #4 Summons Issued Kelly Little Acknowledgement filed by United Specialty Insurance Company. (Harris, David)
October 12, 2018 Filing 15 ***ENTERED IN ERROR***
October 9, 2018 Filing 14 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Oseas Martinez.(Manly, John)
October 3, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Cesar Perez.(McKenzie, Jeremy)
October 3, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy S. McKenzie on behalf of Cesar Perez (McKenzie, Jeremy)
September 26, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Great West Casualty Company answer due 10/16/2018. (thb)
September 25, 2018 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #3 Rule 26(f) Order, #2 Disclosure Statement Local Rule 7.1.1, #1 Complaint, #4 Summons Issued Great West Insurance Casualty Acknowledgement filed by United Specialty Insurance Company. (Harris, David)
September 25, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Alexander Lopez Vazquez answer due 10/9/2018. (thb)
September 25, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Quanariek Roberson answer due 10/15/2018. (thb)
September 25, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Safepay Autobrokers, LLC answer due 10/15/2018. (thb)
September 24, 2018 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Alexander Lopez Vazquez on 9/18/2018, filed by United Specialty Insurance Company. (Harris, David)
September 24, 2018 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #3 Rule 26(f) Order, #2 Disclosure Statement Local Rule 7.1.1, #1 Complaint, #4 Summons Issued Quanariek Roberson Acknowledgement filed by United Specialty Insurance Company. (Harris, David)
September 24, 2018 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #3 Rule 26(f) Order, #2 Disclosure Statement Local Rule 7.1.1, #1 Complaint, #4 Summons Issued Safepay Autobrokers, LLC Acknowledgement filed by United Specialty Insurance Company. (Harris, David)
September 18, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Oseas Martinez answer due 10/9/2018. (thb)
September 18, 2018 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #3 Rule 26(f) Order, #2 Disclosure Statement Local Rule 7.1.1, #1 Complaint, #4 Summons Issued by OSEAS MARTINEZ Acknowledgement filed by United Specialty Insurance Company. (Harris, David)
September 17, 2018 Filing 6 Litigants' Bill of Rights by United Specialty Insurance Company. (Harris, David)
September 17, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Cesar Perez answer due 10/4/2018. (thb)
September 13, 2018 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #3 Rule 26(f) Order, #2 Disclosure Statement Local Rule 7.1.1, #1 Complaint, #4 Summons Issued by CESAR PEREZ Acknowledgement filed by United Specialty Insurance Company. (Harris, David)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to E-Z Auto Sales, LLC, Great West Casualty Company, Kelly Little, Oseas Martinez, Cesar Perez, Quanariek Roberson, Safepay Autobrokers, LLC, Alexander Lopez Vazquez, Wall Street Intermodal, LLC. (thb)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 09/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Blank forms for new civil case filings) (thb)
September 11, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by United Specialty Insurance Company. (thb)
September 11, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 113J.2445487. (thb)
September 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against E-Z Auto Sales, LLC, Great West Casualty Company, Kelly Little, Oseas Martinez, Cesar Perez, Quanariek Roberson, Safepay Autobrokers, LLC, Alexander Lopez Vazquez, Wall Street Intermodal, LLC, filed by United Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(thb) Modified on 9/12/2018 (thb). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/12/2018: #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C) (thb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Specialty Insurance Company v. E-Z Auto Sales, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wall Street Intermodal, LLC
Represented By: Dennis B. Keene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safepay Autobrokers, LLC
Represented By: Tracy C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Little
Represented By: Dennis B. Keene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quanariek Roberson
Represented By: Tracy C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Lopez Vazquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oseas Martinez
Represented By: John Bell Manly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cesar Perez
Represented By: Jeremy S. McKenzie
Represented By: Nicholas Shelton Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E-Z Auto Sales, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great West Casualty Company
Represented By: Dennis B. Keene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Kim M. Jackson
Represented By: David A. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?