Jones v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Marjoram Orris Jones
Defendant: Charles Denson, Timothy Howard, Frederick Johnson, Rodney McCloud and Maintenance Personal
Case Number: 3:2018cv00070
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Dudley H Bowen
Referring Judge: Brian K Epps
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Filing 19 RESPONSE to #13 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Marjoram Orris Jones filed by Charles Denson, Timothy Howard, Frederick Johnson, Rodney McCloud. (Teaster, Susan)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER regarding #15 Motion for Judgment on Pleadings and directing the Clerk to attach a copy of Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 and 41 to Plaintiff' service copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/19/2018. (maa) Modified on 11/20/2018 (jlh).
November 19, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Defendant to Produce Documents by Marjoram Orris Jones. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(maa)
November 19, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . (cmr)
November 15, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #16 MOTION to Stay and Brief in Support Thereof. (pts)
November 15, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Stay and Brief in Support Thereof by Charles Denson, Timothy Howard, Frederick Johnson, Rodney McCloud. Responses due by 11/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Teaster, Susan)
November 15, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Charles Denson, Timothy Howard, Frederick Johnson, Rodney McCloud. Responses due by 11/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion for Judgment on The Pleadings, #2 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Cathy Lewis, #3 Attachment A Standard Operating Procedure IIB05-0001, #4 Attachment B Grievance History Report, #5 Attachment C Movement History)(Teaster, Susan)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff's complaint is deemed amended to correctly reflect Defendant McCloud's name. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/14/2018. (pts)
November 13, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint by Marjoram Orris Jones. Responses due by 11/27/2018. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(pts)
November 13, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Defendant's Answer, filed by Marjoram Orris Jones. (pts)
October 26, 2018 Filing 11 AMENDED Scheduling Notice Setting Amended Pleadings due by 12/23/2018. Discovery due by 3/14/2019. Motions (Including Motions for Summary Judgment) due by 4/13/2019. (pts)
October 25, 2018 Filing 10 SCHEDULING NOTICE: Amended Pleadings due by 12/23/2018. Discovery due by 3/14/2019. Motions (Including Motions for Summary Judgment) due by 4/13/2019. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 12/23/2018. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 1/22/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/25/2018. (pts)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER finding as moot #6 Motion to Produce. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/25/2018. (pts)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER providing Plaintiff with basic instructions regarding the development and progression of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 Rule 4) (pts)
October 18, 2018 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM of Law in opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Marjoram Orris Jones. (thb)
October 18, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Production Order for Transportation to Appear in Court by Marjoram Orris Jones. Responses due by 11/1/2018. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(thb)
October 18, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against City of Helena, Georgia, Charles Denson, Timothy Howard, Frederick Johnson, Maintenance Personal, Rodney McCloud, filed by Marjoram Orris Jones.(thb)
October 2, 2018 Filing 2 Removal NOTICE to all Counsel of Record. (pts)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Telfair County, Georgia, case number 18-cv-091. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113J-2456799) filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, Answer, Summons and Returns)(pts) Modified on 10/2/2018 (pts).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Denson
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Teaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Howard
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Teaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick Johnson
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Teaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney McCloud
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Teaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maintenance Personal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marjoram Orris Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?