Champion v. Webster
Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee
Appellee: Joy R. Webster, The Merchant and Citizens Bank and Morris Bank
Appellant: Archie Joel Champion, III
Case Number: 3:2019cv00029
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Dudley H Bowen
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Archie Joel Champion, III. Amendment to #9 complete Table of Contents and Table of Authorities. (Terry, Christopher)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEF - Appellant Brief by Archie Joel Champion, III. (Terry, Christopher)
May 20, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Appellant Brief due by 6/19/2019. (jlh)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE and Clerk's Certification of Service to Counsel and Parties of Record re this Bankruptcy Appeal. Appellant Brief due by 6/19/2019. (jlh) Modified on 5/20/2019 (jlh).
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 Transmittal of Bankruptcy Record Appellant Brief due by 6/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 17-30330- Record on Appeal, #2 17-30330 - Docket Sheet) (USBC-Toole, Christina)
April 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward B. Claxton, III on behalf of Morris Bank (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Claxton, Edward)
April 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward B. Claxton, III on behalf of The Merchant and Citizens Bank (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Claxton, Edward)
April 18, 2019 Filing 4 OBJECTION by Morris Bank, The Merchant and Citizens Bank. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Claxton, Edward)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 17-30330-SDB. File received, filed by Archie Joel Champion, III. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Order, #3 Notice to Appellant, and #4 Docket Sheet.)(jlh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/12/2019: #5 Motion and Order for Debtor Discharge, #6 Motion for Leave to Appeal) (jlh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Champion v. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Matthew E. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Joy R. Webster
Represented By: Robert M. Matson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: The Merchant and Citizens Bank
Represented By: Edward B. Claxton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Morris Bank
Represented By: Edward B. Claxton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Archie Joel Champion, III
Represented By: Christopher W. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?