CMFG Life Insurance Company v. Seay et al

Plaintiff: CMFG Life Insurance Company
Defendant: David A. Seay, Sarah Lou White, Jael M. Connor and Jonathan Seay
Case Number: 3:2019cv00036
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Dudley H Bowen
Referring Judge: Brian K Epps
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Intent to file a Reply Brief to Plaintiff's #21 Motion for leave to file Amended Complaint and for relief from Order to Deposit by Jonathan Seay. (Hatcher, Eugene) Modified on 6/28/2019 (thb).
June 24, 2019 Filing 22 AMENDED DOCUMENT by CMFG Life Insurance Company. Amended Brief in Support of Motion. (Starr, Jefferson)
June 24, 2019 Filing 21 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint and Motion for relief from Order to deposit by CMFG Life Insurance Company. Responses due by 7/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Briefs Brief in Support of Motion)(Starr, Jefferson). Added MOTION on 6/24/2019 (cmr).
June 21, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Albert P. Reichert, Jr on behalf of Jonathan Seay (Reichert, Albert)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Deposit Funds. It is therefore ordered that Plaintiff tender to the Clerk of Court its check in the payment of the death benefit, and the Clerk of Court shall deposit said check into the Registry until further order of this Court. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 6/13/2019. (pts)
June 5, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint by Jael M. Connor, David A. Seay, Sarah Lou White.(thb)
May 31, 2019 Filing 16 First MOTION to Deposit Funds and Proposed Order by CMFG Life Insurance Company. Responses due by 6/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Motion to Dismiss)(Starr, Jefferson)
May 31, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Jonathan Seay by CMFG Life Insurance Company. (Starr, Jefferson)
May 22, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Jonathan Seay. Amendment to #12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim dated Certificate of Service. (Hatcher, Eugene)
May 22, 2019 Filing 13 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Jonathan Seay. (Hatcher, Eugene)
May 22, 2019 Filing 12 DEFENDANT JONATHAN SEAY'S ANSWER to Complaint WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, COUNTERCLAIM against CMFG Life Insurance Company by Jonathan Seay.(Hatcher, Eugene)
May 17, 2019 Filing 11 Litigants' Bill of Rights by CMFG Life Insurance Company. (Starr, Jefferson)
May 16, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CMFG Life Insurance Company. Jael M. Connor waiver sent on 5/10/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. (Starr, Jefferson)
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CMFG Life Insurance Company. David A. Seay waiver sent on 5/10/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. (Starr, Jefferson)
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CMFG Life Insurance Company. Sarah Lou White waiver sent on 5/15/2019, answer due 7/14/2019. (Starr, Jefferson)
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Eugene S. Hatcher on behalf of Jonathan Seay (Hatcher, Eugene)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CMFG Life Insurance Company. Jonathan Seay waiver sent on 5/6/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Starr, Jefferson)
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Jael M. Connor, David A. Seay, Jonathan Seay, Sarah Lou White. (thb)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Submitted (Attachments: #1 Summons - Jael Connor, #2 Summons - Jonathan Seay, #3 Summons - Sarah Lou White)(Starr, Jefferson)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 5/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Forms) (pts)
May 3, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 113J-2595505. (pts)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by CMFG Life Insurance Company. (pts)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by CMFG Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(pts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CMFG Life Insurance Company v. Seay et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CMFG Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Jefferson Mulloy Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Seay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Lou White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jael M. Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Seay
Represented By: Eugene S. Hatcher
Represented By: Albert P. Reichert, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew Gregory Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?