Messick v. U.S. DOT et al
Plaintiff: Phillip D. Messick
Defendant: U.S. DOT and FMCSA
Case Number: 3:2019cv00061
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Dudley H Bowen
Referring Judge: Brian K Epps
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12117
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered in accordance #9 Order. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/16/2019. (maa)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ADOPTING #7 Report and Recommendations, DISMISSING this case without prejudice, and CLOSING this civil action. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 10/16/2019. (maa)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing service of #7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 09/16/2019. (maa)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the #1 Complaint filed by Phillip D. Messick be DISMISSED without prejudice and that this civil action be CLOSED. Objections to R&R due by 10/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 09/16/2019. (maa)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Phillip D. Messick. (maa)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Phillip D. Messick. (maa)
August 20, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 9/10/2019; and Amended Pleadings due by 9/10/2019. (jlh)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court Orders Plaintiff to pay the full $400.00 filing fee within 21 days of this Order; the court Orders Plaintiff to amend his complaint to include all of his allegations in one document within 21 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 08/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Form - 1, and #2 Complaint Form - 7.) (jlh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2019: #3 Complaint Form 1 (with case no)) (jlh). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2019: #4 Complaint Form 7 (with case no)) (jlh).
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 8/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Blank Forms) (pts)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Phillip D. Messick. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(pts)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Phillip D. Messick.(pts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Messick v. U.S. DOT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DOT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMCSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip D. Messick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?