National Trust Insurance Company et al v. Taylor & Sons, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company and National Trust Insurance Company
Defendant: Taylor & Sons, Inc., Joe Wojtanik, Beverly Lloyd, Madelyn Pollack and Brian LLoyd
Case Number: 3:2019cv00067
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Dudley H Bowen
Referring Judge: Brian K Epps
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice for Attorney David M. Zagoria. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 11/04/2019. (jlh)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice for Attorney Brooks P. Neely. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 11/04/2019. (jlh)
November 1, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance re #13 Notice due by 11/3/2019. (jlh)
November 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #11 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (jlh)
November 1, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance re #12 Notice due by 11/3/2019. (jlh)
November 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #10 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (jlh)
November 1, 2019 Filing 11 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number 113J-2716379, Fee Amount $200, by Beverly Lloyd, Brian Lloyd. Responses due by 11/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Supplement Order of Admission - David)(Nelson, Carlton) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2019: #3 Text of Proposed Order Corrected) (jlh). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2019: #4 Certified Statement) (jlh).
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number 113J-2716371, Fee Amount $200, by Beverly Lloyd, Brian Lloyd. Responses due by 11/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing - Brooks, #2 Supplement Order of Admissions - Brooks)(Nelson, Carlton) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2019: #3 Certified Statement) (jlh).
October 17, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Taylor & Sons, Inc. answer due 10/29/2019. (jlh)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Beverly Lloyd answer due 12/11/2019; Brian Lloyd answer due 12/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/16/2019. (jlh)
October 16, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (cmr)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Taylor & Sons, Inc. on 10/08/19, filed by Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company, National Trust Insurance Company. (Wellesley, Jonathan)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION/Motion - re #1 Complaint, Extending Time to File Answer by Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company, National Trust Insurance Company. (Wellesley, Jonathan) Modified on 10/16/2019 (cmr).
September 30, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Madelyn Pollack answer due 10/16/2019; Joe Wojtanik answer due 10/16/2019. (jlh)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Joe Wotjanik on 9/25/19, filed by Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company, National Trust Insurance Company. (Wellesley, Jonathan)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Madelyn Pollack on 9/25/19, filed by Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company, National Trust Insurance Company. (Wellesley, Jonathan)
September 23, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Beverly Lloyd answer due 10/11/2019; Brian Lloyd answer due 10/11/2019. (jlh)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, by Brian Lloyd and Beverly Lloyd Acknowledgement filed by Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company, National Trust Insurance Company. (Wellesley, Jonathan)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 09/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Blank Forms.) (jlh)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to all Defendants. (jlh)
September 11, 2019 Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number 113J-2680583. (jlh)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against all Defendants, filed by National Trust Insurance Company and Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company (jlh). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/12/2019: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Accident Report, #3 Exhibit C - Monroe Policy, #4 Exhibit D - Umbrella Policy, #5 Exhibit E - National Trust Policy, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (jlh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Trust Insurance Company et al v. Taylor & Sons, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor & Sons, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Wojtanik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Lloyd
Represented By: Carlton Krather Nelson, III
Represented By: David M. Zagoria
Represented By: Brooks P. Neely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madelyn Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian LLoyd
Represented By: Carlton Krather Nelson, III
Represented By: David M. Zagoria
Represented By: Brooks P. Neely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan Skye Wellesley
Represented By: Jonathan Sky Wellesley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Trust Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan Skye Wellesley
Represented By: Jonathan Sky Wellesley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?