Manuel et al v. Sharp Transport, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jacquelyn McCrory Manuel, Sauda Bahati and Uchefuna N. Scie
Defendant: Arch Insurance Co., Sharp Transport, Inc. and William Acker
Case Number: 3:2019cv00077
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Dublin Office
Presiding Judge: Dudley H Bowen
Referring Judge: Brian K Epps
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/08/2019. (Attachments: #1 Blank Forms.) (jlh)
October 8, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: William Acker answer due 10/25/2019; Sharp Transport, Inc. answer due 10/25/2019. (jlh)
October 8, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance re #16 Notice due by 10/22/2019. (jlh)
October 8, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency for Attorneys Nicholas Warlick, Paul Piland, and Richard Edwards, III. (Attachments: #1 Deficiency - Paul Piland, #2 Deficiency - Richard Edwards, III, #3 Pro Hac Vice Form.)(jlh)
October 8, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE to All Counsel of Record re Transfer of Case. (jlh)
October 8, 2019 Filing 14 Case transfer in from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-03849. Case transferred electronically
October 7, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (jpa)
October 7, 2019 Case transferred ELECTRONICALLY to Southern District of Georgia, Dublin Division. (jpa)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion to Transfer Case and this case is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia, Dublin Division. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/4/19. (jpa)
October 4, 2019 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Sharp Transport, Inc., William Acker. Sharp Transport, Inc. served on 10/4/2019; William Acker served on 10/4/2019. (Dougherty, Brenden)
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER re: #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia, Dublin Division. (Dougherty, Brenden)
October 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John Wesley Sherrod on behalf of Jacquelyn McCrory Manuel, Uchefuna N. Scie (Sherrod, John)
October 1, 2019 Clerks Notation re #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement, reviewed and approved by LMM. (rvb)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia, Dublin Division by William Acker, Arch Insurance Co., Sharp Transport, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Police Report)(Dougherty, Brenden)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arch Insurance Co. by Arch Insurance Co..(Dougherty, Brenden)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Arch Insurance Co.. Discovery ends on 2/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Motion to Transfer Venue)(Dougherty, Brenden) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint , as to Arch Insurance. (Piland, Paul)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 9/4/2019. (tmf)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Arch Insurance Co.. (tcc)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to William Acker. (tcc)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Sharp Transport, Inc.. (tcc)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jacquelyn McCrory Manuel, Uchefuna N. Scie. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8891824) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manuel et al v. Sharp Transport, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacquelyn McCrory Manuel
Represented By: Paul Anthony Piland
Represented By: John Wesley Sherrod
Represented By: Nicholas Whinrey Warlick
Represented By: Richard Randolph Edwards, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sauda Bahati
Represented By: Paul Anthony Piland
Represented By: John Wesley Sherrod
Represented By: Nicholas Whinrey Warlick
Represented By: Richard Randolph Edwards, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uchefuna N. Scie
Represented By: Paul Anthony Piland
Represented By: John Wesley Sherrod
Represented By: Nicholas Whinrey Warlick
Represented By: Richard Randolph Edwards, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Insurance Co.
Represented By: Brenden P. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharp Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Brenden P. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Acker
Represented By: Brenden P. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?