PAYNE v. WAL MART
Plaintiff: JOSEPH ANTHONY PAYNE
Defendant: Wal Mart
Case Number: 3:2019cv00080
Filed: October 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Dublin Office
Presiding Judge: Dudley H Bowen
Referring Judge: Brian K Epps
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 MOTION REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (jlh)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Blank Forms.) (jlh)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD. (jlh)
October 21, 2019 Judge Dudley H. Bowen and Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps added. (jlh)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 Case transfer in from District of Georgia Middle; Case Number 5:19-cv-00395. Case transferred electronically
October 18, 2019 Case Electronically Transferred Out - District Transfer to Southern District of Georgia, Dublin Divison. All documents, including a certified copy of the docket sheet and pleading were transferred electronically. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**(Case Transfer Acknowledgment deadline 11/1/2019.) (cma)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER transferring proceedings to the U.S. District Court for the SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF GEORGIA, DUBLIN DIVISION. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E. SELF, III on 10/17/2019. (ech)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to JOSEPH ANTHONY PAYNE (cma)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by JOSEPH ANTHONY PAYNE.(cma)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WAL MART filed by JOSEPH ANTHONY PAYNE. (Attachments: #1 Laurens Superior Court Order for Nolle Prosequi, #2 Transcript of 02/21/2017 Motion to Suppress Hearing, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Envelope)(cma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PAYNE v. WAL MART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH ANTHONY PAYNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal Mart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?