ELLIS v. OLIVER et al
Plaintiff: JEROME ELLIS
Defendant: GIBBONS, Security Oliver, JOHN AND OR JANE DOES and Officer Thomas
Case Number: 3:2020cv00033
Filed: April 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Dudley H Bowen
Referring Judge: Brian K Epps
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 Set Deadlines: Compliance due by 5/18/2020. (maa)
April 27, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Fee Deficiency (Attachments: #1 IFP Form)(maa)
April 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE to All Counsel of Record of Transferal of Action (maa)
April 27, 2020 Filing 7 Case transfer in from District of Georgia Middle; Case Number 5:20-cv-00131. Case transferred electronically
April 27, 2020 Case Electronically Transferred Out - District Transfer to Southern District of Georgia, Dublin Division. All documents, including a certified copy of the docket sheet and pleading were transferred electronically. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**Case Transfer Acknowledgment deadline 5/11/2020. (ggs)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF TRANSFER transferring proceedings to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Georgia, Dublin Division. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 4/27/2020. (kat)
April 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Objection to Dismissal of all Defendants in their individual capacity and agents acting under color of state law by JEROME ELLIS (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Envelope)(ggs)
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Objection to Dismissal of Preliminary Injunction and Restraining Order by JEROME ELLIS (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ggs)
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to JEROME ELLIS (ggs)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Charles H. Weigle issued at the direction of the Court. (ggs)
April 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunction Restraining Order against All Defendants, filed by JEROME ELLIS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ggs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ELLIS v. OLIVER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GIBBONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND OR JANE DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEROME ELLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?