Plummer v. The TJX Companies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Shirley Plummer
Defendant: Officer John Doe, TJ MAXX, Brandon Griffin, John Doe and Kellermeyer Bergensons Services
3Rd Party Plaintiff: The TJX Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00026
Filed: March 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Dudley H Bowen
Referring Judge: Brian K Epps
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting re #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Hold 26f Conference and Submit 26F Report. The parties shall have through and including June 10, 2021, to submit the required 26(f) Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 5/26/21. (loh)
May 26, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: 26(f) Report due by 6/10/2021. (loh)
May 25, 2021 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Hold 26f Conference and Submit 26F Report Due to Addition of New Party , by The TJX Companies, Inc.. Responses due by 6/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Noble, III, Robert)
May 25, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Hold 26f Conference and Submit 26F Report Due to Addition of New Party. (JH)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #7 Third Party Complaint. Kellermeyer Bergensons Services answer due 5/21/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 05/19/2021. (maa)
May 19, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #16 Answer to Third Party Complaint, #7 Third Party Complaint (pts)
May 18, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #16 Answer to Third Party Complaint, #7 Third Party Complaint by Kellermeyer Bergensons Services. Responses due by 6/1/2021. (Minix, Kim)
May 18, 2021 Filing 16 Defenses and ANSWER to Third Party Complaint by Kellermeyer Bergensons Services.(Minix, Kim)
May 17, 2021 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Third-Party Complaint served on Kellermeyer Bergensons Services on 04/14/2021, filed by The TJX Companies, Inc.. (Noble, III, Robert)
May 7, 2021 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Remand filed by Shirley Plummer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Moody, Abigail)
May 5, 2021 Filing 13 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Shirley Plummer. (Moody, Abigail)
April 30, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand filed by The TJX Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Paul Kangas, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Brandon Griffin)(Noble, III, Robert)
April 16, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand by Shirley Plummer. (Attachments: #1 Certifcate of Service)(maa)
April 16, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Abigail K.M. Moody on behalf of Shirley Plummer. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(maa)
April 9, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Kellermeyer Bergensons Services. (JH)
April 8, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Submitted (Noble, III, Robert)
April 8, 2021 Filing 7 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Kellermeyer Bergensons Services, filed by The TJX Companies, Inc..(Noble, III, Robert)
April 5, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by The TJX Companies, Inc..(Noble, III, Robert)
April 5, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by TJ MAXX.(Noble, III, Robert)
April 5, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Brandon Griffin.(Noble, III, Robert)
March 30, 2021 Filing 3 REMOVAL NOTICE to All Counsel of Record. (maa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/30/2021: #1 Corrected Document) (maa).
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 3/30/2021. (maa)
March 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Laurens County, case number 21-CG-0094-DG by Brandon Griffin, TJ MAXX, The TJX Companies, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGASDC-3072295) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Complaint, #3 Other Pleadings, #4 Secretary of State Info, #5 Demand Package, #6 State Court Notice of Removal)(maa)
March 30, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 4/9/2021. (maa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plummer v. The TJX Companies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Plummer
Represented By: Abigail K.M. Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TJ MAXX
Represented By: Robert E. Noble, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Griffin
Represented By: Robert E. Noble, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellermeyer Bergensons Services
Represented By: Kim Mark Minix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: The TJX Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Robert E. Noble, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?