Messick v. Bryant et al
Plaintiff: Phillip Messick
Defendant: Roger Bryant, Johnny L. Smith, Clark Schrader, Mike Smith, Tim Chatman and Randy Rigdon
Case Number: 3:2022cv00021
Filed: March 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Dudley H Bowen
Referring Judge: Brian K Epps
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Roger Bryant, Tim Chatman, Clark Schrader.(Hall, Jon)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Johnny L. Smith.(Havlik, Gwendolyn)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Randy Rigdon answer due 5/13/2022. (thb)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #15 Amended Complaint Acknowledgement filed by Randy Rigdon. (Havlik, Gwendolyn)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Roger Bryant, Tim Chatman, Randy Rigdon, Clark Schrader, Johnny L. Smith, filed by Phillip Messick.(Walker, Emily)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Roger Bryant, Tim Chatman, Clark Schrader.(Hall, Jon)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Substitute Party; Granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Plaintiff shall have seven days from the date of this Order to file a complete amended complaint. Substituted party Randy Rigdon, in his individual capacity of Sheriff of Wheeler County, shall have twenty-one days from acknowledgment of service to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on April 12, 2022. (jrb)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 4/19/2022. (jrb)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint by Johnny L. Smith.(Havlik, Gwendolyn)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #6 Summons Returned Executed, #10 MOTION to Substitute Party Mike Smith by Mike Smith. Responses due by 4/25/2022. (Havlik, Gwendolyn)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #6 Summons Returned Executed, #10 MOTION to Substitute Party Mike Smith. (JH)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Substitute Party Mike Smith by Phillip Messick. Responses due by 4/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Walker, Emily)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #10 MOTION to Substitute Party Mike Smith. (JH)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth E. Barton, III on behalf of Phillip Messick (Barton, Kenneth)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phillip Messick. Johnny L. Smith served on 3/23/2022, answer due 4/13/2022. (Walker, Emily)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phillip Messick. Clark Schrader served on 3/23/2022, answer due 4/13/2022. (Walker, Emily)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phillip Messick. Mike Smith served on 3/23/2022, answer due 4/13/2022. (Walker, Emily)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phillip Messick. Tim Chatman served on 3/23/2022, answer due 4/13/2022. (Walker, Emily)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phillip Messick. Roger Bryant served on 3/23/2022, answer due 4/13/2022. (Walker, Emily)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (csr)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 3/9/2022. (csr)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Phillip Messick. $402.00 Filing Fee Paid; Receipt Number: AGASDC-3300542. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (csr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Messick v. Bryant et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Messick
Represented By: Emily Michele Walker
Represented By: Kenneth E. Barton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Bryant
Represented By: Jon Travis Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny L. Smith
Represented By: Gwendolyn D. Havlik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark Schrader
Represented By: Jon Travis Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Smith
Represented By: Gwendolyn D. Havlik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Chatman
Represented By: Jon Travis Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Rigdon
Represented By: Gwendolyn D. Havlik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?