Davis v. Telfair County et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan C. Davis
Defendant: Telfair County, Edwin Neal, Annie Williams, Jason Boone, Jason White, Dakkia Bradshaw, Chief Billy Johnson, Chris Steverson, Capt. Kyle Carver, Lt. Terry Moon, Staff Sgt. Fussell, Sgt. Alisa Zanders, Deputy FNU Clemmons, Deputy FNU Toler, Deputy Ron Bowdoin, Deputy FNU LNU, Officer Clements, Officer Toby, Officer McRae, Officer Roundtree, Officer Eubanks, Officer Powell, Officer Carter, Officer Hulett, Officer Johnson, Officer Ocasio, Officer McLoon, Officer Battle, Officer Floyd, Officers John and Mary Doe 1-20, Sheriff Sim Davidson, Hospital Authority of Dodge County doing business as Dodge County Hospital, The Southland Medical Group, LLC doing business as Southland Medical, M.D. Dingane Baruti, Telfair County Commissioners, Dr. FNU Goberdahan and Dr. Jane or John Doe
Case Number: 3:2022cv00145
Filed: October 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Dudley H Bowen
Referring Judge: Brian K Epps
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jonathan C. Davis. Hospital Authority of Dodge County served on 12/8/2019, answer due 12/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Executed Summons on Took as Hosp Admin)(Batson, John)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jonathan C. Davis.(wwp) Modified on 12/9/2022 (wwp).
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER finding as moot #9 Motion to Amend/Correct. The Court DIRECTS the CLERK to docket Plaintiffs amended complaint, (doc. no. 9-1), as a stand-alone entry on the docket and to update the caption accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/9/22. (wwp)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jonathan C. Davis. The Southland Medical Group, LLC waiver sent on 11/22/2022, answer due 01/21/2023. (Attachments: #1 Executed Waiver of Summons)(Batson, John) Modified on 12/7/2022 (thb).
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: The Southland Medical Group, LLC answer due 1/21/2023. (thb)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #9 MOTION to Amend/Correct (slt)
November 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to add Defendants, filed by Jonathan C. Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 First Amended Complaint adding Defendants (Batson, John) Modified on 11/28/2022 (slt).
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jonathan C. Davis. Battle waiver sent on 11/22/2022, answer due 1/21/2023; Jason Boone waiver sent on 11/22/2022, answer due 1/21/2023; Ron Bowdoin waiver sent on 11/22/2022, answer due 1/21/2023; Dakkia Bradshaw waiver sent on 11/22/2022, answer due 1/21/2023; Kyle Carver waiver sent on 11/22/2022, answer due 1/21/2023; Sim Davidson waiver sent on 11/22/2022, answer due 1/21/2023; Floyd waiver sent on 11/22/2022, answer due 1/21/2023; Fussell waiver sent on 11/22/2022, answer due 1/21/2023; Hulett waiver sent on 11/22/2022, answer due 1/21/2023; Johnson waiver sent on 11/22/2022, answer due 1/21/2023; McRae waiver sent on 11/22/2022, answer due 1/21/2023; Terry Moon waiver sent on 11/22/2022, answer due 1/21/2023; Edwin Neal waiver sent on 11/22/2022, answer due 1/21/2023; Powell waiver sent on 11/22/2022, answer due 1/21/2023; Chris Steverson waiver sent on 11/22/2022, answer due 1/21/2023; Telfair County waiver sent on 11/22/2022, answer due 1/21/2023; FNU Toler waiver sent on 11/22/2022, answer due 1/21/2023; Jason White waiver sent on 11/22/2022, answer due 1/21/2023; Annie Williams waiver sent on 11/22/2022, answer due 1/21/2023; Alisa Zanders waiver sent on 11/22/2022, answer due 1/21/2023. (Attachments: #1 Executed Waiver of Service)(Batson, John)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Dingane Baruti. (thb)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Submitted (Batson, John)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Johnson, McLoon, McRae. (ca)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Dingane Baruti, Battle, Jason Boone, Ron Bowdoin, Dakkia Bradshaw, Carter, Clements, FNU Clemmons, Sim Davidson, Eubanks, Floyd, Fussell, Hospital Authority of Dodge County, Hulett, John and Mary Doe 1-20, Terry Moon, Edwin Neal, Ocasio, Powell, Roundtree, Chris Steverson, Telfair County, The Southland Medical Group, LLC, Toby, FNU Toler, Jason White, Annie Williams, Alisa Zanders. (ca) Modified on 10/24/2022 (ca). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/24/2022: #1 Corrected Summons) (ca).
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/24/2022. (ca)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Jonathan C. Davis. (ca)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jonathan C. Davis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $402.00, receipt number AGASDC-3451207. (ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Telfair County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan C. Davis
Represented By: John Paul Batson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telfair County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annie Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dakkia Bradshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Billy Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Steverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt. Kyle Carver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Terry Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staff Sgt. Fussell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Alisa Zanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy FNU Clemmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy FNU Toler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Ron Bowdoin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy FNU LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Clements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Toby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer McRae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Roundtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Hulett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Ocasio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer McLoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Battle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officers John and Mary Doe 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Sim Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospital Authority of Dodge County doing business as Dodge County Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Southland Medical Group, LLC doing business as Southland Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Dingane Baruti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telfair County Commissioners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. FNU Goberdahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Jane or John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?