Lemery v. Chambers et al
Plaintiff: Steven Lemery
Defendant: Brian Chambers, Antoine Caldwell, Ms. Braggs, Miss Franklin, Dr. Aeyedn and Miss Cliett
Case Number: 3:2022cv00169
Filed: November 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Dudley H Bowen
Referring Judge: Brian K Epps
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying #15 Motion for Reconsideration for #5 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, filed by Steven Lemery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/27/22. (wwp)
December 22, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Reconsideration re #5 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, by Steven Lemery. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(loh)
December 21, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing signature page re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and MOTION for Order to Show Cause MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, by Steven Lemery (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(loh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/21/2022: #2 Corrected Signature Page) (loh).
December 15, 2022 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #7 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Steven Lemery. (gmh)
December 6, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance re #12 Order due by 1/4/2023. (jlh)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Steven Lemery. The Court orders Plaintiff to pay an initial filing fee of $30.00 within thirty days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/05/2022. (jlh) Modified on 12/6/2022 (jlh).
December 5, 2022 Filing 11 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Steven Lemery. (kjm)
December 5, 2022 Filing 10 CONSENT by Prisoner Steven Lemery to collection of fees. (kjm)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that Plaintiff is directed to comply with the deficiency notice on or before December 19, 2022, re #8 Mail Returned, #7 Notice of Filing Deficiency. (Compliance due by 12/19/2022.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/5/2022. (ca)
December 1, 2022 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail re #7 Notice sent to Steven Lemery. (jlh)
November 10, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Order to Show Cause MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. After 14 days a notice of noncompliance will be submitted to a judicial officer for possible sanctions, to include dismissal. Set Deadline: Compliance due by 11/24/2022. (ca)
November 10, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Order to Show Cause, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Steven Lemery. Responses due by 11/24/2022. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(ca)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and denying #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel subject to compliance with the conditions of this Order. PLRA due by 12/7/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/07/2022. (Attachments: #1 PLRA Forms.) (jlh)
November 3, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Steven Lemery. Responses due by 11/17/2022. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(ca)
November 3, 2022 Filing 3 Inmate Account Statement by Steven Lemery. (ca)
November 3, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Steven Lemery. Responses due by 11/17/2022. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(ca)
November 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Steven Lemery.(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lemery v. Chambers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Lemery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antoine Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Braggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miss Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Aeyedn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miss Cliett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?