Cox v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Michael A. Cox
Defendant: Tarmarshe Smith, Desiree Jones, Warden Jermaine White, Veronica Stewart, Lt. Saldana, Counselor Jane Doe, Moore, Karen Thomas, Counselor John/Jane Doe, Sgt. Moore and Counselor Walker
Case Number: 3:2022cv00184
Filed: December 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Dudley H Bowen
Referring Judge: Brian K Epps
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: PLRA due by 3/17/2023 re: #13 Order. (csr)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Michael A. Cox. The Court orders Plaintiff to pay an initial filing fee of $56.15 within thirty days from the date of this Order. Compliance due by 3/17/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 02/15/2023. (jlh)
February 15, 2023 Filing 12 CONSENT by Prisoner Michael A. Cox to collection of fees. (jlh)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying as moot #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. PLRA due by 2/15/2023. The Court DIRECTS the CLERK to enclose a copy of the form with Plaintiffs service copy of this Order. Failure to return the required paperwork will be an election to have this case dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 1/25/23. (wwp)
January 19, 2023 Filing 10 Inmate Account Statement by Michael A. Cox. (ca)
January 19, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael A. Cox. Responses due by 2/2/2023. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(ca)
January 12, 2023 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER in reference to #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Michael A. Cox. (loh)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #5 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying #6 Motion for Discovery. The Court directs the Clerk to update the caption changing Counselor John/Jane Does name to Counselor Walker. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 1/3/2023. (pts)
December 27, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Doe Discovery by Michael A. Cox. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(wwp)
December 27, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Michael A. Cox. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(wwp)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, subject to compliance with the conditions of this Order. PLRA due by 1/21/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 PLRA Forms.) (jlh)
December 21, 2022 Filing 3 Inmate Account Statement by Michael A. Cox. (ca)
December 21, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael A. Cox. Responses due by 1/4/2023. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(ca)
December 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Michael A. Cox.(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tarmarshe Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desiree Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Jermaine White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veronica Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Saldana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Counselor Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Counselor John/Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Counselor Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?