Finney v. Thomas et al
Plaintiff: Warren Finney, Jr. and Warren Lamar Finney, Jr.
Defendant: Karen Thomas, Ms. Harvey and Anntoinette L. Johnson
Case Number: 3:2023cv00025
Filed: March 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Dudley H Bowen
Referring Judge: Brian K Epps
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 6/7/2023. (wwp)
April 26, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 5/25/2023. (wwp)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Directing USMS Service of Process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 4/24/2023. (maa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/24/2023: #1 USM 285) (maa). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/26/2023: #2 GAS398, AO399) (wwp). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/10/2023: #3 GAS398 AO399) (wwp).
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Warren Finney, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 4/24/2023. (maa)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER directing service of #12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 4/24/2023. (maa)
April 24, 2023 Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Defendants Thomas and Johnson, as well as all official capacity claims for money damages against all Defendants, be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Objections to R&R due by 5/11/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 4/24/2023. (maa)
April 24, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance for printing due by 4/27/2023. (maa)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting re #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections as to #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. The Court grants Plaintiff an extension of time through and including May 9, 2023, to file his objections to the March 27th Report and Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 4/18/23. (loh)
April 18, 2023 Filing 10 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Warren Finney, Jr. (ca)
April 18, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections as to #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, by Warren Finney, Jr. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(loh)
April 18, 2023 Filing 8 CONSENT by Prisoner Warren Finney, Jr. to collection of fees. (loh)
April 18, 2023 Set/Reset Deadline as to #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Objections to R&R due by 5/9/2023 (loh)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing service of the #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on all parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 03/27/2023. (jlh)
March 27, 2023 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff's #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction be denied. Objections to R&R due by 4/13/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 03/27/2023. (jlh)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, subject to compliance with the conditions of this Order; denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. PLRA due by 4/19/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 03/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 PLRA Forms.) (jlh)
March 20, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, by Warren Finney, Jr. Responses due by 4/3/2023. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps. (jlh)
March 20, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, by Warren Finney, Jr. Responses due by 4/3/2023. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps. (jlh)
March 20, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Warren Finney, Jr. Responses due by 4/3/2023. (Attachment: #1 Inmate Account Statement.) REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps. (jlh)
March 20, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Harvey, Anntoinette L. Johnson, and Karen Thomas, filed by Warren Finney, Jr. (jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finney v. Thomas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Finney, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Lamar Finney, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anntoinette L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?