Satcher v. McFarlane
Plaintiff: D'Andre Satcher
Defendant: Andrew McFarlane
Case Number: 3:2023cv00093
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Dudley H Bowen
Referring Judge: Brian K Epps
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing service re #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 1/10/24. (loh)
January 10, 2024 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the U.S. Magistrate Judge that re #1 Complaint should be dismissed without prejudice and this civil action should be closed. Objections to R&R due by 1/29/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 1/10/24. (loh)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, subject to compliance with the conditions of this Order. PLRA due by 12/30/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/30/2023. (Attachments: #1 PLRA Forms.) (jlh)
November 22, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by D'Andre Satcher. Responses due by 12/6/2023. (Attachment: #1 Inmate Account Statement.) REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps. (jlh)
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew McFarlane, filed by D'Andre Satcher. (jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Satcher v. McFarlane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D'Andre Satcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew McFarlane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?