Gadson v. Unnamed Defendant

Plaintiff: Charles Gadson
Defendant: Unnamed Defendant
Case Number: 4:2009cv00002
Filed: January 8, 2009
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Mandamus & Other Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: B. Avant Edenfield
Referring Judge: G. R. Smith
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1361pr

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 4, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations of the Magistrate and dismissing the case as duplicative re 4 Report and Recommendations.. Signed by Judge B. Avant Edenfield on 5/4/2009. (mah)
April 15, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that case be dismissed as duplicative re 1 Complaint filed by Charles Gadson Objections to R&R due by 4/29/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 4/15/2009. (mah)
January 7, 2009 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION Transferring Case to the Southern District of Georgia. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 1/7/09. (dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gadson v. Unnamed Defendant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Gadson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unnamed Defendant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?