Garfield Sr. vs Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Tyrone Rodney Garfield Sr.
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2013cv00008
Filed: January 14, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42:402 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ADOPTING re 19 Report and Recommendations dismissing this case. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 5/28/2014. (loh)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDERED that within thirty days from the entry of this Order, plaintiff shall serve and file a brief setting forth all errors which plaintiff contends entitle the plaintiff to relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 9/16/2013. (loh)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing service. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 5/28/2013. (loh)
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DECLINING TO ADOPT the 3 Report and Recommendations. The case is referred back to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 4/24/13. (wwp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garfield Sr. vs Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Rodney Garfield Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?