Armstrong v. Ocwen Mortgage Company et al

Plaintiff: Edna Armstrong
Defendant: Ocwen Mortgage Company, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Financial Corporation, Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corporation and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 4:2013cv00010
Filed: January 17, 2013
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Referring Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2015 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing as moot 75 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Edna Armstrong. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr. on 9/25/15. (wwp) Modified on 9/25/2015 (wwp).
September 15, 2015 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 83 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs' claims against Defendants are hereby dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 9/14/15. (wwp)
September 9, 2015 104 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S CERTIFICATE/ORDER as to Edna Armstrong. (loh)
August 5, 2015 102 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S CERTIFICATE/ORDER as to Edna Armstrong. (loh)
July 6, 2015 99 Opinion or Order of the Court Clerk Certificate/Order as to Edna Armstrong. (wwp)
May 19, 2015 96 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S CERTIFICATE/ORDER as to Edna Armstrong. (loh)
May 4, 2015 94 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S CERTIFICATE/ORDER as to Edna Armstrong. (loh)
April 6, 2015 90 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S CERTIFICATE/ORDER as to Edna Armstrong. (loh)
February 4, 2015 81 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S CERTIFICATE/ORDER as to Edna Armstrong. (loh)
November 20, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court Clerk's Certificate/Order as to Edna Armstrong. (wwp)
October 21, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S CERTIFICATE/ORDER as to Edna Armstrong. (loh)
September 3, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S CERTIFICATE/ORDER as to Edna Armstrong. (loh)
August 13, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing as Moot 43 Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiffs to Deposit Money into Registry of Court; dismissing as Moot 44 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 8/13/2014. (loh)
March 28, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion to Dismiss. Count Ten of Plaintiff's second amended complaint is dismissed as moot. The remainder of Plaintiff's claims will proceed to trial. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 3/28/2014. (loh)
July 15, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing as Moot re 9 MOTION to Dismiss, Dismissing as moot re 15 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's shall have fourteen days from the date of this order to submit a second verified complaint. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 7/15/2013. (loh)
April 2, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion to Stay Pre-Trial Deadlines and Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 4/2/2013. (loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armstrong v. Ocwen Mortgage Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edna Armstrong
Represented By: Walter Charlton Hartridge, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Mortgage Company
Represented By: Scott H. Michalove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Scott H. Michalove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Financial Corporation
Represented By: Scott H. Michalove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Scott H. Michalove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?