Atlantic Waste Services, Inc. v. Mack Trucks, Inc.
Plaintiff: Atlantic Waste Services, Inc.
Defendant: Mack Trucks, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2014cv00211
Filed: September 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 8/11/17. (wwp)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER and Notice of Pretrial Proceedings, (Pretrial Order due by 7/21/2017). Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 6/21/17. (wwp)
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 3/25/2016. (loh)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2 GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 9/24/2014. (loh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atlantic Waste Services, Inc. v. Mack Trucks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantic Waste Services, Inc.
Represented By: Kate Chapin Lawson
Represented By: Nicholas John Laybourn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mack Trucks, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth D. Crowder
Represented By: David Mitchell Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?