Washington v. Chatham County Police Department
Plaintiff: Matthew Washington
Defendant: Chatham County Police Department
Case Number: 4:2015cv00005
Filed: January 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER directing the Clerk to file a copy the Order in case CV415-5, and CV415-68. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 3/8/17. (wwp)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CLERK'S JUDGMENT that in accordance with the Clerk's Order dated 5/27/15, adopting the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation, judgment is hereby entered dismissing the case without prejudice. (wwp)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ADOPTING for 7 Report and Recommendations dismissing the case without prejudice. In addition, any future filings by Plaintiff are subject to the restrictions outlined in the Report and Recommendation. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 5/27/15. (wwp)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing the Clerk to submit the 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 1 with any objecions to the Honorable William T. Moore, Jr, on 5/13/15. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 4/28/15. (wwp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Chatham County Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chatham County Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?