Evans v. Georgia Regional Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Jameke K. Evans
Defendant: Georgia Regional Hospital, Charles Moss, Lisa Clark and Jamekia Powers
Case Number: 4:2015cv00103
Filed: April 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Each party shall bear it's own costs and attorney's fees. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 01/23/2019. (maa)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 53 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claim for a hostile work environment under Title VII is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, while her claim of unlawful sex discrimination under Section 1983 and Title VII shall proceed. The parties are directed to submit a proposed scheduling order within fourteen days. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 09/25/2018. (maa)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting re 64 Motion to Stay Discovery And All Pre-Trial Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 7/20/18. (loh)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion to Stay. Plaintiff's request for stay is denied, but her alternative request for extension is granted. Plaintiff shall file her amended complaint by the close of business on Monday, September 11, 2017. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 08/04/2017. (thb)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER that the 22 USCA Mandate is made the Order of this Court. It Is Further Ordered that Plaintiff is granted leave to amend her complaint as to her gender non-conformity claim. Plaintiff shall file her forthcoming amended complaint by the clo se of business on Wednesday, August 9, 2017. Plaintiff's failure to file her forthcoming amended complaint within this time frame as directed may result in the dismissal of this action with prejudice without further notice. Compliance due by 8/9/2017. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 07/24/2017. (thb)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER adopting/concurring with the Magistrate Judge's 4 Report and Recommendation as the opinion of the Court; granting Plaintiff's [2-1] Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; dismissing with prejudice Plaintiff's case with no "second chance" amendment option; denying Plaintiff's [2-2] Motion for Appointment of Counsel; granting Lambda Legal Defense & Education Fund, Inc.'s 10 Motion for Leave to File its Amicus brief, which is already in the record 11 and illuminates the conflicting legal currents in this realm; and, to that end, appointing pro hac vice counsel, Gregory R. Nevins, to represent Plaintiff on appeal. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 10/29/2015. (jah)
September 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice; granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to object to the 4 Report and Recommendation Responses due by 10/23/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 9/23/2015. (loh)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing all parties to be served re 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Jameka K. Evans. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 9/9/2015. (loh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Georgia Regional Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jameke K. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Regional Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamekia Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?