O'Kelley v. Warden

Petitioner: Dorian Frank O'Kelley
Respondent: Warden
Case Number: 4:2015cv00104
Filed: April 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Referring Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER denying 106 Motion for Extension of Time and Motion for Status Conference. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 4/8/19. (jrb)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER that the parties are on notice that they are expected to comply with the briefing schedule 57 and that no extensions will be granted by the Court. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 4/2/19. (jrb)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting 94 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Vanessa Carroll; granting 95 Motion to waive filing fee; granting 96 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac vice as to Cory Isaacson; granting 97 Motion to waiver filing fee. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 2/13/19. (jrb)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Denying re 82 Motion for Evidentiary Hearing; Dismissing as Moot re 85 Motion for Ruling on Petitioner's Motion for Evidentiary Hearing. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 3/7/18. (loh)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER denying 61 Motion for Discovery; dismissing as moot 69 Motion dismissed as moot. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 2/2/17. (wwp)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER directing the Clerk to send a copy of the 70 Letter to the Court to counsel for Petitioner and counsel for Respondent.. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 1/26/17. (wwp)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting 55 Second Motion for Scheduling Order ; granting 10 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting 22 Motion for Scheduling ; granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 11/16/15. (bcw)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear for attorney Brian Kammer. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 4/28/15. (wwp)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 4/27/2015. (loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Kelley v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dorian Frank O'Kelley
Represented By: John Paul Batson
Represented By: Brian S. Kammer
Represented By: Lynn Margo Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Represented By: Sabrina D. Graham
Represented By: Rick Tangum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?