Mack v. Herty Advanced Materials Development Center
Plaintiff: Jill E. Mack
Defendant: Herty Advanced Materials Development Center
Case Number: 4:2015cv00196
Filed: July 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Effingham
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: Family and Medical Leave Act of 1993 (FMLA of 1993)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting in part and denying in part re 16 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint In Lieu of Answer. Specifically, Plaintiff's ADA claims against HAMDC are DISMISSED. Similarly, Plaintiff's FMLA claims, to the extent they aris e under the self-care provision, are DISMISSED. Plaintiff's claim that arises under the family-care provision remain pending. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to amend her complaint within thirty days from the date of this Order. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to serve a copy of the complaint and summons as required by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on the Chancellor of the Board. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 12/19/19. (loh)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER directing Herty, LLC to demonstrate within 10 day from the date of this order why it has not responded to the Court's Order of March 22, 2017. Failure to do so will result in Sanctions re 25 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 5/25/17. (jrb)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER administratively terminating 16 Motion to Dismiss. The Court directs Herty Advanced Materials Development Center, and the Board to file a brief within 30 days of the date of this order. The Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 3/22/17. (wwp)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 13 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 8/2/16. (jlm)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER dismissing as moot 6 Motion to Dismiss. The BOR is DIRECTED to file a motion to intervene or to substitute party-if it so desires-within 15 days from the date of this Order. Should the Court grant BOR's motion to intervene, the BOR shall have 30 days to re-file a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 6/29/2016. (loh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mack v. Herty Advanced Materials Development Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill E. Mack
Represented By: Clarence Cuthpert, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herty Advanced Materials Development Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?