Steel Erectors, Inc. v. AIM Steel International, Inc.

Plaintiff: Steel Erectors, Inc.
Defendant: AIM Steel International, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2015cv00208
Filed: July 22, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1352
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 CLERK'S JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk on 05/17/2019. (evk)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER for Plaintiff's counsel to file a renewed motion to withdraw and statement indicating whether his client wishes to prosecute this case within 21 days of service of this Order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to serve this Order on both corporations registered agents to apprise both that they are expected to retain counsel and add them as their attorneys of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 04/08/2019. (evk)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 11/16/16. (wwp)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER dismissing as moot 25 Motion to assign case for jury trial. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 9/19/16. (wwp)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 11 Motion to Compel; denying 16 Motion to Compel; denying 17 Motion to Seal Document ; denying 18 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 1/4/16. (bcw)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 7/22/2015. (loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steel Erectors, Inc. v. AIM Steel International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steel Erectors, Inc.
Represented By: J. Stephen Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIM Steel International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?