Komstadius v. UnitedHealth Group, Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Pehr J. Komstadius
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group, Incorporated, Fidelity Stock Plan Services, LLC and Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC
Case Number: 4:2015cv00241
Filed: September 1, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER APPROVING re 25 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Pehr J. Komstadius. This case is dismissed without prejudice with each party to bear its own fees and costs. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 11/6/2015. (loh)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER directing Plaintiff to file an amended complaint within 14 days of this order. ( Compliance due by 10/19/2015.) Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 10/5/15. (wwp)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting 18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 9/30/2015. (loh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Komstadius v. UnitedHealth Group, Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pehr J. Komstadius
Represented By: Bradley M. Harmon
Represented By: Arnold C. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group, Incorporated
Represented By: Amanda A. Sonneborn
Represented By: Megan E. Troy
Represented By: Erin McPhail Wetty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Stock Plan Services, LLC
Represented By: Erin McPhail Wetty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC
Represented By: Erin McPhail Wetty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?