Seckinger v. Bank of America
Plaintiff: Mallie J. Seckinger
Defendant: Bank of America
Case Number: 4:2015cv00306
Filed: November 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: Lisa G. Wood
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDERED that the parties submit a proposed scheduling order or motion for a scheduling conference within 14 days. ( Compliance due by 2/14/2017.). Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 1/31/17. (wwp)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 38 Motion to Dismiss filed by Bank of America, N.A., 54 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 1/23/17. (slt)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting the 44 MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Caption filed by Mallie J. Seckinger. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 9/27/16. (wwp)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 9 Motion to Dismiss the Complaint and Motion to Strike the Brief in Support of the Complaint. Plaintiff has twenty one days from the date this Order is served to amend his Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 4/6/2016. (loh)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 13 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), all claims against Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Bank of America, Transunion LLC, and Equifax Information Services, LLC shall remain Defendants in this action. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 3/7/2016. (ca)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 8 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 2/23/2016. (loh)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER consolidating Equifax (CV415-309), TransUnion (CV415-310), and Experian (CV415-308), into this case (CV415-306). Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 1/12/2016. (ca)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seckinger v. Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mallie J. Seckinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?