Wittig v. CSX Transportation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Wittig and Jeffrey Wittig
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv00050
Filed: February 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: G R Smith
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER directing the Clerk to close the case re #59 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by CSX Transportation, Inc. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 10/4/17. (wwp)
October 3, 2017 Filing 59 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by CSX Transportation, Inc. (Traynham, Jay) Modified on 10/4/2017 (wwp).
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Administratively Closing this action. The Parties have notified the Court that the above captioned case has settled. (Compliance due by 10/10/2017.) Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 8/11/2017. (ca)
July 7, 2017 Filing 57 NOTICE of Change of Address by Joseph C. Devine. (Devine, Joseph)
July 7, 2017 Filing 56 NOTICE of Change of Address by Lindsey D'Andrea. (D'Andrea, Lindsey)
June 9, 2017 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Proposed Consolidated Pretrial Order due by 8/15/2017. (wwp)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #54 Motion for Extension of Time to File proposed pretrial order. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 6/9/17. (wwp)
June 8, 2017 MOTIONS REFERRED: #54 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Consolidated Pretrial Order. (wwp)
June 2, 2017 Filing 54 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Consolidated Pretrial Order by CSX Transportation, Inc.. Responses due by 6/16/2017. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Joint Consent Motion)(D'Andrea, Lindsey)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER denying Plaintiff Jeffrey Wittig's #24 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying Defendant CSX Transportation, Inc.'s #29 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 5/17/2017. (ca)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #51 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Wade Wilkes Herring, II terminated. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 5/15/2017. (ca)
May 4, 2017 Filing 51 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by CSX Transportation, Inc.. Responses due by 5/18/2017. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Herring, Wade)
April 25, 2017 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Jay C. Traynham on behalf of CSX Transportation, Inc. (Traynham, Jay)
April 17, 2017 Filing 49 BRIEF re #47 Transcript,, Post Argument Supplemental Brief by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (D'Andrea, Lindsey)
April 10, 2017 Filing 48 BRIEF Post Argument Supplemental Brief by Jeffrey Wittig. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Ballew, Walter)
April 7, 2017 Filing 47 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 040/06/2017, before Judge Lisa Godbey Wood. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debbie Gilbert, Telephone number (912) 262-2608. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. (Transcript Redaction Policy Issued or Click here to view < Transcript Redaction Policy<) Redaction Request due 4/28/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/6/2017. (Gilbert, Debra)
April 6, 2017 Filing 46 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood: Motion Hearing held on 4/6/2017 re #29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CSX Transportation, Inc., #24 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jeffrey Wittig. (Court Reporter Debbie Gilbert.) (WS)
March 31, 2017 Filing 45 BRIEF re #29 MOTION for Summary Judgment Supplemental Brief Identifying Recent Decisions Interpreting the Federal Railroad Safety Act by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Herring, Wade)
March 14, 2017 Filing 43 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #29 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #24 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 4/6/2017 10:00 AM in Savannah - 1st Floor before Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood. (WS)
December 27, 2016 Filing 42 REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jeffrey Wittig. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1-A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Ballew, Walter)
December 22, 2016 Filing 41 REPLY to Response to Motion re #29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 13 to Mr. Wittig's Deposition)(D'Andrea, Lindsey)
December 16, 2016 Filing 40 AMENDED DOCUMENT by CSX Transportation, Inc.. Amendment to #36 Response, #35 Statement of Material Facts Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts. (Herring, Wade)
December 16, 2016 Filing 39 AMENDED DOCUMENT by CSX Transportation, Inc.. Amendment to #36 Response, Defendant's Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (Herring, Wade)
December 12, 2016 Filing 36 RESPONSE to #24 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jeffrey Wittig filed by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Stmt of Material Fact CSXT's Response to Mr. Wittig's Statement of Facts, #2 Exhibit Mr. Hester's Deposition Excerpts, #3 Exhibit Mr. Wittig's Deposition Excerpts, #4 Exhibit Mr. Cokley's Depositoin Excerpts, #5 Exhibit Mr. Cokley's Declaration)(D'Andrea, Lindsey)
December 8, 2016 Filing 35 Statement of Material Facts re #29 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Jeffrey Wittig. (Ballew, Walter)
December 8, 2016 Filing 34 RESPONSE to #29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CSX Transportation, Inc. filed by Jeffrey Wittig. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Ballew, Walter)
December 8, 2016 Filing 33 RESPONSE to Motion re #29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jeffrey Wittig. (Ballew, Walter)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time. If the case remains pending in whole or in part after the Court has ruled on both parties' motions for summary judgment, then the parties shall have thirty (30) days after the entry of the Court's order(s) on both summary judgment motions to file their proposed consolidated pretrial order. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 11/17/16. (jlm)
November 16, 2016 MOTIONS REFERRED: #31 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Order. (jlm)
November 16, 2016 Filing 31 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Order. by CSX Transportation, Inc.. Responses due by 12/5/2016. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Herring, Wade)
November 15, 2016 Filing 30 NOTICE issued re: #29 MOTION for Summary Judgment by CSX Transportation, Inc. Responses due by 12/8/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Briefs CSXT's Memorandum in Support, # 2 Stmt of Material Fact CSXT's Statement of Material Undisputed Facts, # 3 Exhibit Patrick Cokley Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Plaintiff Deposition Excerpts, # 5 Exhibit Cokley Deposition Excerpts, # 6 Exhibit Hester Deposition Excerpts, # 7 Exhibit Rod Logan Declaration)(D'Andrea, Lindsey) (jlm)
November 14, 2016 Filing 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment by CSX Transportation, Inc.. Responses due by 12/8/2016. (Attachments: #1 Briefs CSXT's Memorandum in Support, #2 Stmt of Material Fact CSXT's Statement of Material Undisputed Facts, #3 Exhibit Patrick Cokley Declaration, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff Deposition Excerpts, #5 Exhibit Cokley Deposition Excerpts, #6 Exhibit Hester Deposition Excerpts, #7 Exhibit Rod Logan Declaration)(D'Andrea, Lindsey)
November 9, 2016 Filing 28 NOTICE issued re: #24 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Jeffrey Wittig. Responses due by 12/1/2016. (Ballew, Walter) (jlm)
November 7, 2016 Filing 27 NOTICE of Filing by Jeffrey Wittig re #24 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Ballew, Walter)
November 7, 2016 Filing 26 Statement of Material Facts re #24 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Jeffrey Wittig. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Ballew, Walter)
November 7, 2016 Filing 25 BRIEF re #24 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Jeffrey Wittig. (Ballew, Walter)
November 7, 2016 Filing 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Jeffrey Wittig. Responses due by 12/1/2016. (Ballew, Walter)
October 20, 2016 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 11/14/2016. Opposition to Dispositive Motions due by 12/12/16. (wwp)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to file dispositive motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 10/20/16. (wwp)
October 19, 2016 Filing 22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/14/2016 . by CSX Transportation, Inc.. Responses due by 11/7/2016. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Herring, Wade)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 7/22/2016. (ca)
July 21, 2016 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Protective Order and Memorandum by CSX Transportation, Inc. Responses due by 8/8/2016. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Herring, Wade) Modified on 7/21/2016 (wwp).
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/17/2016. Discovery due by 8/5/2016. Motions due by 11/3/2016. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 6/4/2016. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 7/4/2016. Pretrial Order due 1/2/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 4/20/16. (wwp) Modified on 5/5/2016 (wwp).
April 12, 2016 Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (D'Andrea, Lindsey)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 3/31/2016. (loh)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 3/31/2016. (loh)
March 30, 2016 MOTIONS REFERRED: #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joseph C. Devine Receipt Number 113J-1955905, Fee Amount $200,, #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lindsey D'Andrea Receipt Number 113J-1955899, Fee Amount $200, (wwp)
March 29, 2016 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joseph C. Devine Receipt Number 113J-1955905, Fee Amount $200, by CSX Transportation, Inc.. Responses due by 4/15/2016. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Herring, Wade)
March 29, 2016 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lindsey D'Andrea Receipt Number 113J-1955899, Fee Amount $200, by CSX Transportation, Inc.. Responses due by 4/15/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Herring, Wade)
March 18, 2016 Filing 13 Litigants' Bill of Rights by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Herring, Wade)
March 18, 2016 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Herring, Wade)
March 18, 2016 Filing 11 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by CSX Transportation, Inc..(Herring, Wade)
March 18, 2016 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Hardy Gregory. Order #9 remailed to Hardy Gregory at updated address-602 East 16th Avenue, Suite D, Cordele, Ga 31015. (bcw) Modified on 3/18/2016 (bcw).
March 8, 2016 Filing 9 Clerk Extention 6.1/ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Response due by 3/18/2016. (wwp)
March 8, 2016 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to 3/18/2016 . by CSX Transportation, Inc.. Responses due by 3/25/2016. (Herring, Wade)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 2/24/2016. (loh)
February 17, 2016 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for (Jefferson C. Callier), Fee Amount $200, by Jeffrey Wittig. (Attachments: #1 Rec't)REFERRED to Judge G. R. Smith.(loh)
February 10, 2016 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jeffrey Wittig. (loh)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 2/10/2016. (loh)
February 10, 2016 Filing 4 Certificate of Related Cases 3.1. (loh)
February 10, 2016 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CSX Transportation, Inc. (loh)
February 10, 2016 Filing 2 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Jeffrey Wittig. (loh)
February 10, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CSX Transportation, Inc., filed by Jeffrey Wittig. Receipt # 113J-1931264. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wittig v. CSX Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wittig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Wittig
Represented By: Hardy Gregory, Jr.
Represented By: Jefferson C. Callier
Represented By: Walter W. Ballew, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Jay C. Traynham
Represented By: Joseph C. Devine
Represented By: Lindsey D'Andrea
Represented By: Wade Wilkes Herring, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?