Binns et al v. Saxe et al

Plaintiff: Andrew Binns and Debra Binns
Defendant: Christina Saxe and Adam Lawrence Saxe
Case Number: 4:2016cv00071
Filed: March 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Overpayment and Enforcement of Judgment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER that the parties' Joint Notice of Agreement to Consent Judgment 20 is Granted and that the attached CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT is ENTERED on therecord of this case. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of Plaintiffs and against Defendants in accordance with the terms of the Consent Final Judgment and to terminate all motions and deadlines and Close this case. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 4/3/17. (cmr)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 10 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 7/26/2016. (loh)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice for attorney Shelley Momo. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 3/23/16. (wwp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Binns et al v. Saxe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Binns
Represented By: Charles A. Dorminy
Represented By: Shelley Driskell Momo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Binns
Represented By: Charles A. Dorminy
Represented By: Shelley Driskell Momo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Saxe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Lawrence Saxe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?