Ajibade et al v. Harris et al
Plaintiff: Soloman Oludamisi Ajibade, Adenike Hannah Ajibade, The Estate of Mathew Ajibade and Chris Oladapo
Defendant: John Wilcher, Corizon Health, Inc., Corizon, LLC, Gregory Brown, Burt Ambrose, Frederick Burke, Abram Burns, Mark Capers, Maxine Evans, Andrew Evans-Martinez, Paul Folsome, Debra Johnson, Jason Kenny, Christopher Reed, Eric Vinson and Benjamin Webster
Case Number: 4:2016cv00082
Filed: March 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER granting re 340 Consent MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to TERMINATE all deadlines and motions and to CLOSE this case. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 1/10/20. (loh)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER ADMINISTATIVELY CLOSING AND STAYING this CASE until April 26, 2019. The Court ORDERS all remaining parties to file a status report (one report for Plaintiffs, one report for each set of Defendants represented by the same counsel, and one report for each defendant proceeding without counsel) on or before April 26, 2019. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to ensure that this Order is served on all unrepresented Defendants, and those Defendants are specifically advised that they must file a timely status report. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 3/28/19. (jrb)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER granting re 184 Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 1/15/19. (loh)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER granting in part and denying in part re 201 Motion to exclude testimony of Darrell Ross. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 6/11/18. (loh)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER denying 167 Motion for Reconsideration re 164 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 6/7/18. (loh)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 113 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Defendant Wilcher's motion with respect to Plaintiffs' assault and battery claim, and 42 U.S.C. 1983 excessive force claim is GRANTED and these claims are DISMISSED. However, Defendant Wilcher's request for summary judgment as to Plaintiffs' wrongful death claim is DENIED. As a result, Defendant Wilcher is entitled to summary judgment on Counts four and six. Defendant Wilcher is not entitled to summary judgment on Plaintiffs' claim in Count Five for wrongful death. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 1/25/18. (loh)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 125 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 145 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part 146 Motion ; granting in part and denying in part 151 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part 156 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 11/9/17. (jrb)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting re 142 Motion to Seal Settlement Agreement. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 8/3/17. (loh)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDERED that within 21 days from the date this Order is served, the parties should confer and attempt to agree to a protective order that will allow plaintiffs' counsel to conduct discovery. This includes taking Riner's testimony, while preventing Riner or Corizon from forfeiting the benefit of their bargained-for protection from public disclosure. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 7/19/17. (loh)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 104 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The Scheduling Order is amended. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 2/2/17. (wwp)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 82 Motion to Compel; granting 83 Motion to Compel. The Court Orders that defendant pay Plaintiffs' "reasonable expenses incurred in making their motion to compel, "including attorney f ees." Defendant Folsome is Ordered to serve his initial disclosures and his responses to plaintiffs' interrogatories and requests for production within 10 days from the date of this Order is served. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 1/10/17. (wwp)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER: Within 30 days of this Court's Order, Savannah Psychiatry is ordered to produce Mathew Ajibade's complete treatment records, including his billing records, prescriptions (for medication and referrals to other providers), and a list of dates of treatment/attendance. (Compliance due by 2/5/2017). Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 1/5/17. (jlm)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting 67 Motion to Dismiss Ambrose, Reed and Webster. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 9/9/16. (jlm)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER denying as moot 54 Motion for Entry of Default; granting 72 Motion to open default. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 6/14/16. (wwp)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER denying as moot 47 Motion for Entry of Default; granting 55 Motion to open default. Within 10 days of the date this order is served, plaintiff must file a complete answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 6/6/16. (wwp)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying 40 Motion for Entry of Default; granting 43 Motion to Open Default; granting 45 Motion to Open Default. Within ten days of the date this Order is served Defendant Vinson must refile a complete answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 5/9/2016. (loh)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice; granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 3/31/2016. (loh)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 3/29/2016. (loh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ajibade et al v. Harris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Soloman Oludamisi Ajibade
Represented By: William F. Cash, III
Represented By: William R. Claiborne
Represented By: Alyssa J. Flood
Represented By: Cameron Kuhlman
Represented By: Timothy M. O'Brien
Represented By: Mark M. O'Mara
Represented By: Troy A. Rafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adenike Hannah Ajibade
Represented By: William F. Cash, III
Represented By: William R. Claiborne
Represented By: Alyssa J. Flood
Represented By: Cameron Kuhlman
Represented By: Timothy M. O'Brien
Represented By: Mark M. O'Mara
Represented By: Troy A. Rafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of Mathew Ajibade
Represented By: William F. Cash, III
Represented By: William R. Claiborne
Represented By: Alyssa J. Flood
Represented By: Cameron Kuhlman
Represented By: Timothy M. O'Brien
Represented By: Mark M. O'Mara
Represented By: Troy A. Rafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Oladapo
Represented By: William F. Cash, III
Represented By: William R. Claiborne
Represented By: Alyssa J. Flood
Represented By: Cameron Kuhlman
Represented By: Timothy M. O'Brien
Represented By: Mark M. O'Mara
Represented By: Troy A. Rafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Wilcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burt Ambrose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abram Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Capers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxine Evans
Represented By: Robert P. Phillips, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Evans-Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Folsome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Vinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?