Ray Capital Inc et al v. M/V Newlead Castellano et al
Plaintiff: Ray Capital Inc, Oppenheim Capital Limited, Cheyenne Holdings LTD and Labroy Shiptrade Limited
Defendant: M/V Newlead Castellano and Newlead Castellano LTD
Case Number: 4:2016cv00093
Filed: April 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER GRANTING 148 MOTION Administrative Relief. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 146 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, 116 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, 147 Clerk's Judgment, 129 Judgment, and 128 Order on Motion for Rec onsideration are hereby AMENDED to reflect that the judgment entered in favor of Plaintiffs in this matter was against NCL and the proceeds from the interlocutory sale of the Vessel, but not DHL or the vessel itself. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 146 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct and 147 Clerk's Judgment are hereby AMENDED to reflect that DHL was added as an additional defendant in this matter by way of the Reconsideration Order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to issue and Amended Judgment in accordance with this order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 4/19/2018. (pts)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 131 Motion to Stay Pending Appeal and to Approve Supersedeas Bond. It is ORDERED that the temporary stay of execution entered in this matter pursuant to the Court's Order dated September 28, 2017 SHAL L EXPIRE at 5:01 p.m. EST on October 30, 2017 without further notice or judicial action. It is FURTHER ORDERED that DHL MUST post and file with the Clerk of this Court a supersedeas bond in the amount of $1,417,766.13 on or before 5:00 p.m. EST on Monday, October 30, 2017. Upon DHL's timely filing of the aforementioned supersedeas bond as instructed, this matter SHALL be stayed pending DHL's presently pending appeal. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 10/25/17. (loh)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE/ORDER as to Bouhan Falligant, LLP re 134 Order. (loh)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Plaintiffs. (loh)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting 43 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff shall ten (10) days of the entry of this Order to perfect the record with admissible evidence with regards to the balance of their claims against Defendants through the date of this Order. The Court Orders the Defendants to show cause, in writing, as to why the Court should not: (a) dismiss with prejudice Defendants' counterclaim against Plaintiffs; and (b) close this case. Defendants shall file a show cause memorandum, through counsel, with the Clerk by no later than ten (10) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 03/20/2017. (thb)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER denying 99 Motion to Stay. The Clerk is directed to terminate 60 Motion to Consolidate Cases; 68 Motion for Hearing; and 82 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 11/18/2016. (thb)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting 101 Motion for Disbursement of Funds in the amount of $9,320.54 USD. The Clerk of Court is Ordered to disburse $9,320.54 USD from the funds held in the Court's registry in relation to the matter to counsel for Plaint iffs' escrow account, the details of which shall be provided directly to the Clerk by Plaintiffs' counsel under separate cover. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate 96 Motion for Disbursement of Funds. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 11/03/2016. (thb)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting 86 Third Motion In Custodia Legis Expenses in the amount of $9,320.54 USD, which, together with the $695,370.37 USD previously authorized by the Court's Orders dated July 14 and September 12, 2016 (Docs. 48, 81), covers in custodia legis expenses incurred by Plaintiffs through August21, 2016. (Doc. 86-1, at 2-3, 6-7.) Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 10/07/2016. (thb)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER denying DHL Project & Chartering Limited's 80 Motion to Intervene; and denying as moot DHL Project & Chartering Limited's 90 Motion to Authorize 'in custodia legis expenses'. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 10/4/2016. (jah)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting 69 Second Motion to Authorize In Custodia Legis Expenses, granting 77 First Motion to Distribute Proceeds of Sale. The Clerk is ordered to disburse $695,370.37 USD from the funds held in the Court's registry in relation to this matter to Plaintiff's counsel's escrow account, the details of which shall be provided directly to the Clerk by Plaintiff'scounsel under separate cover. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 9/12/16. (cmr)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER OF CONFIRMATION OF SALE as outlined in the body of this Order and including instructions to the United States Marshal and the Clerk of Court, etc. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 8/16/2016. (jah)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 49 Emergency Motion for Reconsideration re 47 Order on Motion to Vacate; vacating its 47 July 14, 2016 Order to the extent it addresses the arrest of the Vessel; reinstating Plaintiffs' arrest of the Vessel; and denying Defendants' 59 Cross-Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 8/4/2016. (jah)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 51 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice; granting 52 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 7/26/2016. (loh)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER FOR SALE OF M/V CASTELLANO AND RELATED RELIEF granting Plaintiff's 28 Motions to Inspect the Vessel, to Authorize In Custodia Legis Expenses, and to Sell the Vessel, subsequent to the Court's hearing held on July 11, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. at the United States Courthouse in Savannah, Georgia, and as fully outlined in the body of this Order; authorizing In Custodia Legis Expenses in the amount of $455,407.20, which covers costs incurred by Plaintiffs through the end of June 20 16 [Doc. 43, Ex. 4]; directing that Defendants will have seven (7) days to respond, pursuant to Plaintiffs' in-court request, to Plaintiffs' future Motions to Authorize In Custodia Legis Expenses; ordering the sale of the Vessel shall proce ed as follows per the instructions in paragraph (5) of this Order, including the Order that the United States Marshal for the Southern District of Georgia, Savannah Division is to conduct an admiralty sale of the Vessel as specified and to commence on Monday, August 8, 2016, etc.; and directing the Clerk to enter an order upon the docket (which shall be satisfied by this, the Clerk's docket entry) providing that Defendants shall file their opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment no later than Friday, July 22, 2016. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 7/12/2016. (Clerk's note - A copy of this Order was delivered to the resident Deputy Marshal in Augusta for immediate transmission to the United States Marshal in Savannah, Georgia.) (jah)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER directing Defendants to submit their Briefs by 6/23/2016. Thereafter, on Monday, a hearing on Defendant's motion to vacate will be held on 6/27/2016 10:00 AM in Savannah - 1st Floor before Judge J. Randal Hall. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 6/10/16. (cmr)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 20 Motion for Leave to Appear for attorney Neil Quartaro ; granting 21 Motion for Leave to Appear for attorney Zachary Farley. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 5/19/16. (wwp)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 17 Motion for Leave to Appear for attorney Thomas Tisdale. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 5/12/16. (wwp)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing issuance of process of maritime attachment and garnishment. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 4/19/16. (wwp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ray Capital Inc et al v. M/V Newlead Castellano et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Capital Inc
Represented By: Todd Michael Baiad
Represented By: Zachary J. Farley
Represented By: Neil A. Quartaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oppenheim Capital Limited
Represented By: Todd Michael Baiad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheyenne Holdings LTD
Represented By: Todd Michael Baiad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Labroy Shiptrade Limited
Represented By: Todd Michael Baiad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Newlead Castellano
Represented By: Robert S. Glenn, Jr.
Represented By: Philip M. Thompson
Represented By: Thomas L. Tisdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newlead Castellano LTD
Represented By: Robert S. Glenn, Jr.
Represented By: Philip M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?