DHL Project & Chartering Limited v. Newlead Holding LTD et al
Plaintiff: DHL Project & Chartering Limited
Defendant: Newlead Holdings LTD, Newlead Shipping S.A., Newlead Bulkers S.A., Newlead Castellano LTD, Grand Venetico Inc and Newlead Venetico LTD
Case Number: 4:2016cv00123
Filed: May 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying 33 Motion for Entry of Final Judgment; denying as moot 40 Motion to Strike. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 9/13/17. (loh)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 16 Motion to Vacate; denying 17 Motion to Strike. DHL shall show cause by no later than December 5, 2016 why the present case should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 11/18/2016. (thb)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 11 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 8/25/2016. (jah)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 6/9/2016. (loh)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER of issuance of process of maritime attachment and garnishment. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 5/25/16. (wwp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DHL Project & Chartering Limited v. Newlead Holding LTD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DHL Project & Chartering Limited
Represented By: William E. Dillard, III
Represented By: James H. Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newlead Holdings LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newlead Shipping S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newlead Bulkers S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newlead Castellano LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Venetico Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newlead Venetico LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?