WELCH v. MICKENS

Petitioner: MARIA DAPHNE WIGGINS WELCH
Respondent: Sue Mickens
Case Number: 4:2016cv00271
Filed: October 18, 2016
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Savannah Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2017 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING the 23 Report and Recommendations denying the 2254 Petition and construing the 24 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by MARIA DAPHNE WIGGINS WELCH as an objection to the Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 6/27/17. (wwp)
April 13, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS denying the 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by MARIA DAPHNE WIGGINS WELCH. Objections to R&R due by 4/28/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 4/13/17. (wwp) Modified on 4/14/2017 (wwp).
November 1, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 8 Motion for Reconsideration (in letter form). Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 11/1/16. (Copy mailed to plaintiff at Pulaski State Prison, PO Box 839, Hawkinsville, GA 31036-0839.) (jlm)
October 20, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by MARIA DAPHNE WIGGINS WELCH. Compliance due by 12/20/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 10/20/16. (jlm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WELCH v. MICKENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MARIA DAPHNE WIGGINS WELCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sue Mickens
Represented By: Jason Matthew Rea
Represented By: Paula K. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?