Fredrick v. Georgia Superior Clerks Cooperative Authority et al
Plaintiff: Dante G. Fredrick
Defendant: F. Barry Wilkes and J. Williams
Case Number: 4:2016cv00310
Filed: November 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 18 Report and Recommendations 15 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Dante G. Fredrick. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 5/19/17. (trb)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS dismissing without prejudice the 14 Complaint filed by Dante G. Fredrick, revoking the 15 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Dante G. Fredrick. As to any future civil actions sought to be commenced in forma pauperis (IFP) by plaintiff, the Clerk be DIRECTED to receive the papers, open a single miscellaneous file for tracking purposes, and forward them to the presiding judge for a determination as to whether plaintiff qualifies for an exception to the "three strikes" bar to IFP status (in other words, has demonstrated he is in imminent danger of seriousphysical injury) and whether he has stated a civil rights claim with anyarguable merit. Only if the pleading alleges a plausible c laim for reliefwill the Court allow it to be filed. IFP complaints that fail to pass muster shall be DISMISSED without any further judicial action after THIRTY (30) DAYS from the date the Clerk receives the Complaint,unless the Court orders otherwise . This automatic dismissal ofinsubstantial claims "will reduce the burden of paper-moving andexplanation-writing, conserving a little judicial time for litigants whodeserve attention. Thus, although the Court will read and considerany future IFP application and complaint that Fredrick endeavors to file, it will not necessarily enter an order addressing the IFP application orcomplaint. If no order is forthcoming, then THIRTY (30) DAYS afterthe Complaint's receipt the Clerk shall, withou t awaiting any furtherdirection, notify Fredrick that his case has been dismissed per the formattached as an appendix to this R&R. Objections to R&R due by 4/24/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 4/10/17. (wwp) Modified on 4/10/2017 (wwp).
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 12 Motion to reopen case. Plaintiff must return the 1983 Prionser Civil Rights form and the Prisoner Trust Account Statement to the Clerk within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 3/20/17. (wwp)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS dismissing the case without prejudice. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 2/14/17. (wwp)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting the 2 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account. ( Compliance to return the PLRA forms due by 12/28/2016.) The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to serve along with a copy of this Order (1) a 42 U.S.C. § 1983 form complaint, (2) a Prisoner Trust Account Statement form, and (3) the Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account form. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the service of this Order to fill out and return all three forms. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 12/1/16. (wwp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fredrick v. Georgia Superior Clerks Cooperative Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dante G. Fredrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Barry Wilkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?