Clemens v. Morales
Petitioner: James D. Clemens
Respondent: Jose Morales
Case Number: 4:2017cv00040
Filed: March 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: Lisa G. Wood
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 02:431
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER ADOPTING 28 Report and Recommendations of the Magistrate Judge as the opinion of the Court. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 7/11/2017. (ca)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDERED that the petitioner is to update the Court on his current location, his Illinois criminal proceedings (if any), his Georgia parole proceedings (if any) and his arguments in opposition to respondent's motion to dismiss (if any). ( Compliance due by 5/24/2017.) Signed by Judge G.R. Smith on 5/10/2017. (wwp) Modified on 5/10/2017 (wwp).
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 21 Motion to Seal Document Exhibits D and E. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 4/5/17. (wwp)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER directing respondent to file a response addressing petitioner's claim that Warden Morales has failed to process the request for disposition of the detainer against him. ( Compliance due by 3/30/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 3/22/17. (wwp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clemens v. Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James D. Clemens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jose Morales
Represented By: Paula K. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?