Sanders v. Lanier Collection Agency & Service, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2017cv00061
Filed: March 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: Lisa G. Wood
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ADOPTING 8 Report and Recommendations of the Magistrate Judge as the opinion of the Court. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 7/21/2017. (ca)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION dismissing without prejudice the 1 Notice of Removal, filed by Lanier Collection Agency & Service, Inc. (Objections to R&R due by 7/14/2017). Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 6/29/17. (wwp)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED that Sanders shall, within 11 days of the date this Order is served, show why this case should not be dismissed without prejudice for abandonment and violation of a Court rule. ( Compliance due by 6/26/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 6/15/17. (wwp) Modified on 6/15/2017 (wwp).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders v. Lanier Collection Agency & Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?