Campbell v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Gerald Carmichael Campbell
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 4:2017cv00094
Filed: May 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER ADOPTING the 21 Report and Recommendations, affirming the Acting Commissioner's final decision, closing this civil action, and directing the Clerk to enter final judgment in favor of the Acting Commissioner. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 06/01/2018. (thb)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that within 14 days of the date this Order is served, plaintiff shall file his opening brief or face a recommendation of dismissal of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 2/15/18. (jrb)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER directing the plaintiff that within 14 days of the date of this order is served, to either pay his filing fee or otherwise show cause why this case should not be dismissed on inactivity and, thus, abandonment grounds. Failure to respond to this Order will result in a recommendation of dismissal of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 2/2/18. (jrb)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER instructing the plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint within 21 days from the date this order is served. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 6/14/17. (jrb)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER instructing the plaintiff to file supplemental financial information within 14 days from the date of this order re 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gerald Carmichael Campbell. Nancy A. Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of Social Security substituted for Carolyn W. Colvin. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 5/30/17. (jrb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Carmichael Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Jason W. Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?