Savior v. Laughlin

Petitioner: Mustafa Savior
Respondent: Vance Laughlin
Case Number: 4:2017cv00103
Filed: June 13, 2017
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Referring Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: Lisa G. Wood
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2017 15 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that in accordance with this Court's Order entered on November 6,2017, the Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED as the opinion of this Court Savior's 2241 petition is dismissed. Petitioner is not entitled to a Certificate of Appealability. rendering moot any request for in forma pauperis status on appeal. This action stands closed. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 1/6/17. (jrb)
November 6, 2017 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING re 13 Report and Recommendations, dismissing Savior's 2241 petition. Petitioner is also not entitled to a Certificate of Appealability, rendering moot any request for in forma pauperis status on appeal. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 11/6/17. (loh)
September 15, 2017 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that respondent is to provide to the Court a copy of Chatham County trial court's April 6, 2017, Order denying Savior's extraordinary motion for a new trial within seven days of service of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 9/14/17. (loh)
August 31, 2017 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Motion to Intervene as a Party Respondent. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 8/29/17. (loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Savior v. Laughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mustafa Savior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Vance Laughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?