Harris v. Savannah Chatham Metropolitan Police Department

Plaintiff: Eric Latroy Harris
Defendant: Savannah Chatham Metropolitan Police Department
Case Number: 4:2017cv00154
Filed: August 21, 2017
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Referring Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2018 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Harris to amend his complaint within 30 days from the date of this order to identify the individual officers he contends subjected him to excessive force. (Amended Pleadings due by 8/12/2018.) Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 7/13/18. (jrb)
June 4, 2018 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing counsel to secure copies of any incident report and file with the Clerk within 30 days from the date of this Order. (Compliance due by 7/4/2018). Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 6/4/18. (wwp)
April 25, 2018 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying re 29 Motion/Notice. Harris is, therefore, DIRECTED to amend his complaint to identify the "CNT Agents" he contends subjected him to excessive force. He must file that amendment, by signing it and placing it within his prison's mail system, within 30 days from the date of this Order. Failure to comply may result in dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 4/25/18. (loh)
April 18, 2018 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 24 Motion for Discovery. The Court DIRECTS counsel who prepared the limited Answer on behalf of the City and County to secure copies of the police incident reports pertainingto Harris arrest on July 13, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 4/18/18. (jrb)
January 17, 2018 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the clerk to serve Harris with a copy of the Courts form § 1983 prisoner civil rights complaint, motion to proceed in forma pauperis, prisoner trust fund statement, and consent to collection of fees form. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 1/17/18. (jrb)
January 2, 2018 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 18 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 2/2/18. (jrb)
December 7, 2017 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 12 Motion to Produce; denying 13 Motion to Produce; denying 14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Harris is directed to only refer to, and the Clerk is directed to docket any future filings in cv417-154. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 12/7/17. (wwp)
September 18, 2017 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Latroy file an Amended Complaint within 30 days of the day this Order is served. (Compliance due by 10/18/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 9/18/17. (wwp) Modified on 9/18/2017 (wwp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Savannah Chatham Metropolitan Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Latroy Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Savannah Chatham Metropolitan Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?